SHAIKH v. QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C. et al
Plaintiff: FAKHRUNI SHAIKH
Defendant: QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C. and QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C. CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv04684
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/9/2019 at 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER.(sc, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with certificate of service by QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C., QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C. CORPORATION.(HAMILL, JOSEPH)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with with affirmative Defenses by QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C., QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C. CORPORATION.(HAMILL, JOSEPH)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Valentine re: served Summons in a Civil Action upon Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C. Corporation, c/o Corporation Service Co. by Personal Service on 12/19/2018 (GENTER, RICHARD)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FAKHRUNI SHAIKH. QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C. waiver sent on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (GENTER, RICHARD)
October 30, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FAKHRUNI SHAIKH. (ti, )
October 30, 2018 Summons Issued as to QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C., QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C. CORPORATION. Two Originals Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/31/18 (ti, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C., QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C. CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 187146.), filed by FAKHRUNI SHAIKH. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheets)(ti, ) Modified on 10/31/2018 (ti, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAIKH v. QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C.
Represented By: JOSEPH J. HAMILL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QATAR AIRWAYS Q.C.S.C. CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH J. HAMILL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAKHRUNI SHAIKH
Represented By: RICHARD E. GENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?