HAJOCA CORPORATION v. FOX
Plaintiff: HAJOCA CORPORATION
Defendant: NICHOLAS J. FOX
Case Number: 2:2018cv04898
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HAJOCA CORPORATION. NICHOLAS J. FOX waiver sent on 12/6/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (HINO, MICHAEL)
November 16, 2018 1 Summons Issued as to NICHOLAS J. FOX. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/19/2018 (amas)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NICHOLAS J. FOX, filed by HAJOCA CORPORATION.(amas)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL, NO LATER THAN 11/21/2018, EITHER FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT PLEADING DEFENDANT'S CITIZENSHIP; OR SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS THIS CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/14/2018. 11/14/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(amas)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HAJOCA CORPORATION.(ahf)
November 13, 2018 Summons Issued as to NICHOLAS J. FOX. 1 Given To: Counsel on 11/14/2018 (ahf)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NICHOLAS J. FOX ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 187827.), filed by HAJOCA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAJOCA CORPORATION v. FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS J. FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAJOCA CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?