DOMINGUEZ v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JORGE DOMINGUEZ
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC, DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC and QUICKEN LOANS
Case Number: 2:2018cv04971
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by QUICKEN LOANS.(ABBOTT, THOMAS)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME FOR DEFENDANT OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC HAS UNTIL 1/17/19 TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/20/18. 12/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 1/2/2019 (rf, ).
December 18, 2018 Filing 23 TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by TRANS UNION, LLC.(HUSE, WILLIAM)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT DITECH FINANCIAL LLC SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME, THROUGH AND INCLUDING JANUARY 18, 2019, TO ANSWER THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/17/18. 12/17/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR FILING A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER IS EXTENDED TO JANUARY 2, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/17/18. 12/17/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 12/17/2018 (jaa, ).
December 17, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN PATRICK SEAMAN on behalf of OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC (SEAMAN, BRIAN)
December 14, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by QUICKEN LOANS..(WIEAND, DONALD) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 12/14/2018 (md).
December 13, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY F. REICHNER on behalf of DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC with Certificate of Service(REICHNER, HENRY)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF THOMAS N. ABBOTT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/13/18. 12/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED. *ECF REGISTRATION/NOTIFICATION PACKET SENT TO ABBOTT ON 12/13/18*(rf, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ryan Flaska re: served summons and complaint upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by personal service on 11/27/18 (VULLINGS, BRENT)
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas N. Abbott ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13223671.) filed by QUICKEN LOANS, Statement, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Order)(WIEAND, DONALD) Modified on 12/12/2018 (md).
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD E. WIEAND, JR on behalf of QUICKEN LOANS, with Certificate of Service(WIEAND, DONALD) Modified on 12/12/2018 (md).
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL JANUARY 17, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/7/18. 12/7/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF WILLIAM M. HUSE, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/7/18. 12/7/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF BRITTANY S. ZIMMER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/7/18.12/7/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Brittany S. Zimmer, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13211444.) filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..certificate of counsel, affidavit, certificate of service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William M. Huse, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13211144.). (GREEN, CASEY)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JORGE DOMINGUEZ re: Robyn Buda served Summons and Complaint upon OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC by personal service. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JORGE DOMINGUEZ re: D'Wayne Henriksson served Summons and Complaint upon TRANS UNION, LLC by personal service. TRANS UNION, LLC served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JORGE DOMINGUEZ re: Katie Big Eagle served Summons and Complaint upon DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC by personal service. DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JORGE DOMINGUEZ re: P. C. Perovich served Summons and Complaint upon QUICKEN LOANS by personal service. QUICKEN LOANS served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 12(b) Procedural Order(CJL)
November 16, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JORGE DOMINGUEZ. (jwl, )
November 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, QUICKEN LOANS, TRANS UNION, LLC. Five Forwarded To: Counsel on 11/16/18 (jwl, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, QUICKEN LOANS, TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13175942.), filed by JORGE DOMINGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOMINGUEZ v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: BRITTANY S. ZIMMER
Represented By: MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: BRIAN PATRICK SEAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: CASEY GREEN
Represented By: WILLIAM M. HUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC
Represented By: HENRY F. REICHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUICKEN LOANS
Represented By: DONALD E. WIEAND, JR.
Represented By: THOMAS N. ABBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE DOMINGUEZ
Represented By: BRENT F. VULLINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?