UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC, AND ITS LOCAL 88G v. DOW CHEMICAL CO.
Plaintiff: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC, AND ITS LOCAL 88G
Defendant: DOW CHEMICAL CO.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05047
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DOW CHEMICAL CO. TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 2/5/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 1/18/19. 1/18/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC, AND ITS LOCAL 88G. DOW CHEMICAL CO. waiver sent on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/20/2019. (KILBERT, NATHAN) Modified on 12/6/2018 (fb).
November 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC, AND ITS LOCAL 88G. (jwl, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF A LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DOW CHEMICAL CO. on 11/20/18 by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC, AND ITS LOCAL 88G. Waiver of Service due by 12/20/2018. (jwl, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOW CHEMICAL CO. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 188234.), filed by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC, AND ITS LOCAL 88G.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC, AND ITS LOCAL 88G v. DOW CHEMICAL CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC, AND ITS LOCAL 88G
Represented By: NATHAN KILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOW CHEMICAL CO.
Represented By: RAYMOND A. KRESGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?