THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY v. ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY
Defendant: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES, INC., NL INDUSTRIES, INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY and THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv05128
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISISON OF LEON F. DEJULIUS, JR IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/23/19. 1/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHARLES H. MOELTENBERG JR IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/23/19. 1/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. *ECF NOTIFICATION/REGISTRATION PACKET SENT TO MOELTENBERG ON 1/23/19*(rf, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO 2/21/2019, AND FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE REPLY BRIEFS TO 3/7/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/22/19. 1/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Remand by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY. (PUGH, WILLIAM) Modified on 1/23/2019 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
January 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY..(IOLE, JOHN) (FILING FEE PAID) Modified 1/23/19 (fdc).
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY..(IOLE, JOHN) (FILING FEE PAID) Modified 1/23/19 (fdc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including BP America Inc. by ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY.(ROSENBERG, RACHEL)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 1/7/2019, TO FILE A MOTION TO REMAND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/7/2019. 1/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A-B)(SENOFF, DAVID)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including DowDuPont Inc. by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY.(CARTER, JULIANA)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIANA CARTER on behalf of E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY (CARTER, JULIANA)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP W. NEWCOMER on behalf of THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY (NEWCOMER, PHILIP)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 AMENDED COMPLAINT, #3 Affidavit, #4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #5 AMENDED COMPLAINT, #6 Affidavit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Affidavit, #10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #12 Affidavit, #13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #14 Affidavit, #15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #16 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #17 PAPERS FWD)(amas)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PPG INDUSTRIES, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY F. TURNER on behalf of PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(TURNER, TIFFANY)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE 20 DAYS AFTER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/7/2018. 12/7/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL M. ROSENBERG on behalf of ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY (ROSENBERG, RACHEL)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY. (SACHSE, WILL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 12/6/2018 (md).
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Rachel Rosenberg by WILL W. SACHSE on behalf of ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY (SACHSE, WILL) Modified on 12/6/2018 (md). (FILED IN ERROR; ATTY HAS REFILED AT PAPER #8) Modified on 12/7/2018 (md).
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Robert C. Heim by WILL W. SACHSE on behalf of ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY (SACHSE, WILL) Modified on 12/6/2018 (md).
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILL W. SACHSE on behalf of ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY (SACHSE, WILL)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 11/29/2018. 11/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY.(amas)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY from MONTGOMERY COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 18-23539. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 188492) (Attachments: #1 NOTICE, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Designation Form, #16 Case Management Track Form) (amas, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY v. ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
Represented By: JULIANA CARTER
Represented By: PHILIP N. YANNELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. EDELSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT C. HEIM
Represented By: WILL W. SACHSE
Represented By: RACHEL M. ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY
Represented By: WILLIAM H. PUGH, V
Represented By: LEON F. DEJULIUS, JR.
Represented By: JOHN E. IOLE
Represented By: CHARLES H MOELTENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY
Represented By: DAVID S. SENOFF
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?