IN RE: PAULINE A. HINTON
Trustee: WILLIAM MILLER*R, FREDERICK L. REIGLE and UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Debtor In Possession: PAULINE A. HINTON
Case Number: 2:2018cv05159
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED AND THE MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/2/2019. 1/3/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Original Bankruptcy record received together with notice from Bankruptcy Court that the designation of the record on appeal has not been filed and with Motion to Reconsider filed in Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Counsel of Record, Notice of Appeal. Order being Appealed)(jwl, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of PAULINE A. HINTON from the order of Bankruptcy Judge JEAN K. FITZSIMON filed on 11/28/18 with Motion to reconsider the order of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Appeal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: PAULINE A. HINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: WILLIAM MILLER*R
Represented By: WILLIAM MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: FREDERICK L. REIGLE
Represented By: FREDERICK L. REIGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: PAULINE A. HINTON
Represented By: VAUGHN A. BOOKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?