IN RE: CHERI SHAKUR
Trustee: GARY F. SEITZ and UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Debtor In Possession: CHERI SHAKUR
Case Number: 2:2018cv05179
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Original Bankruptcy record received together with notice from Bankruptcy Court that the designation of the record on appeal has not been filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jwl, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Denying Motion for IFP from Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 ORDER AND DOCKET)(sg, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. Additional documents, Order Scheduling hearing for fee. (Attachments: #1 DOCKET AND ORDER)(sg, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of CHERI SHAKUR, CHERI SHAKUR from the order of Bankruptcy Judge ERIC L. FRANK filed on 11/15/18 with motion for IFP. (Attachments: #1 Entire docket, etal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, ) Modified on 12/3/2018 (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: CHERI SHAKUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: GARY F. SEITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: CHERI SHAKUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?