LEYMAN et al v. SPIRIT CRUISES LLC et al
Plaintiff: LIDIYA LEYMAN and DAVID LEYMAN
Defendant: FREEDOM ELITE YACHT CHARTERS, ENTERTAINMENT CRUISES, INC., SPIRIT CRUISES LLC and ALEXANDER REZNIK
Case Number: 2:2018cv05185
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason E. Laning re: served Summons & Complaint upon Alexander Reznik by perosnal service on 12/21/18 (BOUVIER, JOSEPH)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/20/2019 AT 11:30 A.M. IN THE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, ROOM 8613, PHILA., PA, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/22/19. 1/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTY.(kw, )
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND TO STATE COURT [ECF 7] IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/18/19.1/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTY.(kw, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Response In Opposition re #7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by ENTERTAINMENT CRUISES, INC., SPIRIT CRUISES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Memorandum) (CALDER, STEPHEN)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by ENTERTAINMENT CRUISES, INC., FREEDOM ELITE YACHT CHARTERS, SPIRIT CRUISES LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit 2, #14 Exhibit 3, #15 Exhibit 4)(CALDER, STEPHEN)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DAVID LEYMAN, LIDIYA LEYMAN.Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H)(BOUVIER, JOSEPH)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ALEXANDER REZNIK by ENTERTAINMENT CRUISES, INC., FREEDOM ELITE YACHT CHARTERS, SPIRIT CRUISES LLC.(CALDER, STEPHEN)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by James G. Robinson re: served Praecipe to Reinstate Writ of Summons, Reinstated Writ of Summons upon Manager by Personal Service on 11/8/18 (BOUVIER, JOSEPH)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by James G. Robinson re: served Praecipe to Reinstate Writ of Summons, Reinstated Writ of Summons upon Manager by Personal Service on 11/8/18 (BOUVIER, JOSEPH)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent ENTERTAINMENT CRUISES, INC. for SPIRIT CRUISES LLC. by SPIRIT CRUISES LLC.(jwl, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ENTERTAINMENT CRUISES, INC..(jwl, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ENTERTAINMENT CRUISES, INC., SPIRIT CRUISES LLC from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 18090260. Certificate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 188731) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Case Management Track Form, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Designation Form)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEYMAN et al v. SPIRIT CRUISES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREEDOM ELITE YACHT CHARTERS
Represented By: STEPHEN M. CALDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENTERTAINMENT CRUISES, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN M. CALDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRIT CRUISES LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN M. CALDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER REZNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIDIYA LEYMAN
Represented By: JOSEPH F. BOUVIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LEYMAN
Represented By: JOSEPH F. BOUVIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?