MEACHAM v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff: SAMANTHA RENEE MEACHAM
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv05245
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: THOMAS J RUETER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 Social Security Magistrate Consent by SAMANTHA RENEE MEACHAM.. (OSTERHOUT, KARL)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE CONSENT TO OR DECLINATION OF JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; FAILURE TO COMPLETE AND FILE THE FORM AS ORDERED HEREIN SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent) 12/31/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Nancy A. Berryhill Social Security Administration and Attorney General via Federal Express (nd, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Standing Procedural Order for Cases Seeking Social Security Review 12/11/18 Entered and copies emailed. (jaa, )
December 7, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 2 U.S. MARSHALS AND 1 U.S. ATTORNEYS on 12/11/18. (jaa, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES ETC. AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 12/7/18.12/10/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(jaa, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by SAMANTHA RENEE MEACHAM. IFP PENDING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(jaa, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by SAMANTHA RENEE MEACHAM.(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEACHAM v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA RENEE MEACHAM
Represented By: KARL E. OSTERHOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?