DAVIS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff: CHARMAINE TOWANDA DAVIS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv05247
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARILYN HEFFLEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHARMAINE TOWANDA DAVIS re: David F. Chermol, Esq. served Summons and Complaint upon COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY by Certified Mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed on Attorney General of USA, DOJ)(CHERMOL, DAVID) Modified on 1/23/2019 (fb).
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Social Security Magistrate Consent by CHARMAINE TOWANDA DAVIS.. (CHERMOL, DAVID)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE FORM WITHIN TEN DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO COMPLY AND FILE THE FORM AS ORDERED HEREIN SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL EXERCISE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 1/7/19. 1/7/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. (JL)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Procedural Order 12/7/18 Entered and copies e-mailed. (mbh, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(mbh, )
December 6, 2018 Three (3) Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Two forwarded to counsel on COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY and U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and one given to U.S. ATTORNEY. (mbh, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE188935) filed by CHARMAINE TOWANDA DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Managment Track form, #3 Designation form)(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARMAINE TOWANDA DAVIS
Represented By: DAVID F. CHERMOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?