BYRD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff: ANTONIO MICHAEL BYRD
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv05248
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Social Security Magistrate Consent by ANTONIO MICHAEL BYRD.. (CHERMOL, DAVID)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE CONSENT TO OR DECLINATION OF JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)1/2/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 US Marshal Return Re: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED UPON THE ATTY. GENERAL AND NANCY BERRYHILL BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 12/26/2018.(amas)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Standing Social Security Procedural Order 12/12/2018 Entered and copies e-mailed. (amas)
December 11, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 2 Forwarded To THE US MARSHALS AND 1 TO THE US ATTORNEY on 12/12/2018.(amas)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AT THE FOLLOWING ADDRESSES OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE US ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 12/11/2018.12/12/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(ahf)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by ANTONIO MICHAEL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY ANTONIO MICHAEL BYRD.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BYRD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO MICHAEL BYRD
Represented By: DAVID F. CHERMOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?