KENNEDY v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: CHRISTINA FAITH KENNEDY
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv05258
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JACOB P HART
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 US Marshal Return Re: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED UPON THE ATTY. GENERAL AND NANCY BERRYHILL BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 12/19/2018.(amas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Procedural Order 12/10/18 Entered and copies e-mailed. (er, )
December 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney General 2 Originals Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal on 12/10/18. 1 Original to U.S. Attorney. (er, )
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(I), ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 12/10/18.12/10/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, US MARSHAL.(er, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Social Security Magistrate Consent by CHRISTINA FAITH KENNEDY.. (SILVER, JOSEPH)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(ahf)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by CHRISTINA FAITH KENNEDY.(ahf)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILEDD BY CHRISTINA FAITH KENNEDY.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA FAITH KENNEDY
Represented By: JOSEPH B SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?