KENNEY et al v. AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE
Plaintiff: KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, ALEXA JOSHUA, GERARD KENNEY and GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO
Defendant: AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE
Case Number: 2:2018cv05260
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F KELLY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE (ABIM) TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL REMAIN AS INITIALLY STIPULATED AND ABIM'S RESPONSE SHALL BE DUE 3/18/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 2/1/19. 2/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, against AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, filed by GERARD KENNEY, ALEXA JOSHUA, KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO.(amas)
January 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by ALEXA JOSHUA, GERARD KENNEY, KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO of Filing of Amended Class Action Complaint (CURLEY, C.)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED 30 DAYS UP TO AND INCLUDING 3/18/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 1/10/19. 1/10/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by MANSI SHAH on behalf of AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE with Certificate of Service(SHAH, MANSI)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH P. WEISSERT on behalf of AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE with Certificate of Service(WEISSERT, ELIZABETH)
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by LESLIE E. JOHN on behalf of AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE with Certificate of Service(JOHN, LESLIE)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. LECKERMAN on behalf of AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE with Certificate of Service(LECKERMAN, JASON)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GERARD KENNEY, ALEXA JOSHUA, KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REUBEN, MINDEE)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF SAMUEL G. ROYKO, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 12/27/18. 12/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF CYNTHIA H. HYNDMAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 12/27/18. 12/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF C. PHILIP CURELY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 12/27/18. 12/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF ALAN F. CURLEY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 12/27/18. 12/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF KATRINA CARROLL, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 12/27/18. 12/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samuel G. Royko by ALEXA JOSHUA, GERARD KENNEY, KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13245688.). (REUBEN, MINDEE)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cynthia H. Hyndman by ALEXA JOSHUA, GERARD KENNEY, KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13245681.). (REUBEN, MINDEE)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of C. Phillip Curley by ALEXA JOSHUA, GERARD KENNEY, KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13245673.). (REUBEN, MINDEE)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan F. Curley by ALEXA JOSHUA, GERARD KENNEY, KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13245666.). (REUBEN, MINDEE)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katrina Carroll by ALEXA JOSHUA, GERARD KENNEY, KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13245647.). (REUBEN, MINDEE)
December 6, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALEXA JOSHUA, GERARD KENNEY, KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO. (ahf)
December 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/7/2018 (ahf)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 188958.), filed by GERARD KENNEY, ALEXA JOSHUA, KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE, GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEY et al v. AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE MURRAY LEISURE
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: KATRINA CARROLL
Represented By: SAMUEL G. ROYKO
Represented By: C. PHILIP CURLEY
Represented By: CYNTHIA H. HYNDMAN
Represented By: ALAN F. CURLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXA JOSHUA
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: KATRINA CARROLL
Represented By: SAMUEL G. ROYKO
Represented By: C. PHILIP CURLEY
Represented By: CYNTHIA H. HYNDMAN
Represented By: ALAN F. CURLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERARD KENNEY
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: KATRINA CARROLL
Represented By: SAMUEL G. ROYKO
Represented By: C. PHILIP CURLEY
Represented By: CYNTHIA H. HYNDMAN
Represented By: ALAN F. CURLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN DELA CRUZ MANALO
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: KATRINA CARROLL
Represented By: SAMUEL G. ROYKO
Represented By: C. PHILIP CURLEY
Represented By: CYNTHIA H. HYNDMAN
Represented By: ALAN F. CURLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE
Represented By: MANSI SHAH
Represented By: ELIZABETH P. WEISSERT
Represented By: LESLIE E. JOHN
Represented By: JASON A. LECKERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?