DOMBROWSKI v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: JOHN J. DOMBROWSKI and JOHN J. DOMBROWSKI, JR.
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv05336
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: HENRY S PERKIN
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 8 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg, )
January 14, 2019 7 Affidavit of Service re: U.S. Marshal Service served Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General by FedEx on 1/7/19 and Social Security Admin by FedEx on 1/8/19 (mbh, )
December 31, 2018 6 Social Security Magistrate Consent by JOHN J. DOMBROWSKI, JR.. (SUTTON, THOMAS)
December 13, 2018 5 Procedural Order 12/13/18 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (mas, )
December 13, 2018 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General 2 Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal and 1 Forwarded To: A.U.S.A. on 12/13/18. (mas, )
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(I), AT THE FOLLOWING ADDRESSES: OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL, REGION III SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, 300 SPRING GARDEN STREET, 6TH FLOOR, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19123-2932; UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, 950 PENNSYLVANIA AVENUE, NW WASHINGTON, DC 20530-0001. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 12/13/18.12/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO THE U.S. MARSHAL AND TO THE A.U.S.A. AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
December 11, 2018 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(amas)
December 11, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by JOHN J. DOMBROWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)
December 11, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JOHN J. DOMBROWSKI.(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOMBROWSKI v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. DOMBROWSKI
Represented By: THOMAS D. SUTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. DOMBROWSKI, JR.
Represented By: THOMAS D. SUTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?