WILLIAMS v. ELLIOTT et al
Plaintiff: TERRY WILLIAMS
Defendant: MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT, WARNER MUSIC, INC., TIMOTHY ZACHARY MOSLEY, WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ESTATE OF AALIYAH HAUGHTON, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., TIMBALAND, MISSY, ATLANTIC RECORDS, WARNER MUSIC GROUP and ELEKTRA RECORDS
Case Number: 2:2018cv05418
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TERRY WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NECHEMIA, ASHLEY)
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by TERRY WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NECHEMIA, ASHLEY)
January 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT.Brief, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KRATT, JACOB)
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Court of Common Pleas filed by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Text of Proposed Order, #13 Certificate of Service)(KRATT, JACOB)
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC..Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Brad Cohen, #4 Declaration of Rell Lafargue, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(OLSON, HEATHER)
January 22, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Court of Common Pleas filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(OLSON, HEATHER)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jl, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOSEPH G. COLAO, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/7/2019. 1/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND TO JOSEPH COLAO WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHAEL A. TRAUBEN, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/7/2019. 1/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND TO MICHAEL TRAUBEN WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT, IS GRANTED AN EXTENSIO OF TIME, UNTIL 1/22/2019, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/7/2019. 1/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Court of Common Pleas filed by TERRY WILLIAMS.Notice of Motion, Motion to Remand, Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Motion, #2 Supplement Motion to Remand, #3 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(NECHEMIA, ASHLEY)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph G. Colao by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13262901.). (KRATT, JACOB)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. with Certificate of Service by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC..(OLSON, HEATHER)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC..(OLSON, HEATHER)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Trauben by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13259064.). (KRATT, JACOB)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SARAH SCHACTER TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/21/2018. 12/26/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF BARRY I. SLOTNICK, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/21/2018. 12/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO BARRY SLOTNICK WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, AND WARNER MUSIC, INC. ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 1/22/2019, TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/21/2018. 12/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of BARRY I. SLOTNICK by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13242426.). (OLSON, HEATHER)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of SARAH SCHACTER by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13242406.). (OLSON, HEATHER)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER REARDON OLSON on behalf of ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION, WARNER MUSIC, INC. with certificate of service(OLSON, HEATHER)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 181101709. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 189491)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. ELLIOTT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY WILLIAMS
Represented By: ASHLEY S. NECHEMIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA ARNETTE ELLIOTT
Represented By: JACOB FRANCIS KRATT
Represented By: JOSEPH G. COLAO
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TRAUBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: BARRY I. SLOTNICK
Represented By: SARAH SCHACTER
Represented By: HEATHER REARDON OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY ZACHARY MOSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORPORATION
Represented By: BARRY I. SLOTNICK
Represented By: SARAH SCHACTER
Represented By: HEATHER REARDON OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: BARRY I. SLOTNICK
Represented By: SARAH SCHACTER
Represented By: HEATHER REARDON OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION
Represented By: BARRY I. SLOTNICK
Represented By: SARAH SCHACTER
Represented By: HEATHER REARDON OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTATE OF AALIYAH HAUGHTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC.
Represented By: BARRY I. SLOTNICK
Represented By: SARAH SCHACTER
Represented By: HEATHER REARDON OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMBALAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISSY
Represented By: JACOB FRANCIS KRATT
Represented By: JOSEPH G. COLAO
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TRAUBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC RECORDS
Represented By: BARRY I. SLOTNICK
Represented By: SARAH SCHACTER
Represented By: HEATHER REARDON OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER MUSIC GROUP
Represented By: BARRY I. SLOTNICK
Represented By: SARAH SCHACTER
Represented By: HEATHER REARDON OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELEKTRA RECORDS
Represented By: BARRY I. SLOTNICK
Represented By: SARAH SCHACTER
Represented By: HEATHER REARDON OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?