BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. THE PHIL'S TAVERN, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., FULL VOLUME MUSIC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT GMBH, UNIVERSAL - SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, DON KIRSCHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY AND CRUVEN, INC., SCRAP METAL MUSIC, ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC and UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.
Defendant: SALVATORE PAONE, THE PHIL'S TAVERN, INC. and CHARLES COMPAGNUCCI
Case Number: 2:2018cv05420
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To The Phil's Tavern, Inc. d/b/s The Phil's Tavern and Charles Compagnucci with Prejudice(COHEN, STANLEY)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To Salvatore Paone without Prejudice(COHEN, STANLEY)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., FULL VOLUME MUSIC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT GMBH, ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, UNIVERSAL - SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC., SCRAP METAL MUSIC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, DON KIRSCHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY AND CRUVEN, INC. re: Stanley Cohen served Summons and Complaint upon SALVATORE PAONE by Electronic Mail. SALVATORE PAONE served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (COHEN, STANLEY)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., FULL VOLUME MUSIC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT GMBH, ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, UNIVERSAL - SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC., SCRAP METAL MUSIC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, DON KIRSCHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY AND CRUVEN, INC. re: Stanley Cohen served Summons and Complaint upon CHARLES COMPAGNUCCI by Electronic Mail. CHARLES COMPAGNUCCI served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (COHEN, STANLEY)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., FULL VOLUME MUSIC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT GMBH, ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, UNIVERSAL - SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC., SCRAP METAL MUSIC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, DON KIRSCHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY AND CRUVEN, INC. re: Stanley Cohen served Summons and Complaint upon THE PHIL'S TAVERN, INC. by Eletronic Mail. THE PHIL'S TAVERN, INC. served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (COHEN, STANLEY)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent BERTELSMANN, INC. for BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT GMBH, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC ; Corporate Parent WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. for UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP.; Corporate Parent VIVENDI SA for SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., UNIVERSAL - SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC.; Corporate Parent CBS PUBLISHING INC. for DON KIRSCHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY AND CRUVEN, INC. ; Corporate Parent SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, INC. for SONY/ATV SONGS LLC; Corporate Parent EIGHTH NOTE, INC. for CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC.; Corporate Parent EMI GROUP GLOBAL LTD. for EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC.; Corporate Parent TEGNA, INC. for BROADCAST MUSIC, INC.. by BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT GMBH, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., DON KIRSCHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY AND CRUVEN, INC., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., UNIVERSAL - SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP..(ahf, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, FULL VOLUME MUSIC, SCRAP METAL MUSIC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC.(ahf)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (ahf)
December 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to CHARLES COMPAGNUCCI, SALVATORE PAONE, THE PHIL'S TAVERN, INC. 3 Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/17/2018 (ahf)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHARLES COMPAGNUCCI, SALVATORE PAONE, THE PHIL'S TAVERN, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 189511.), filed by BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., FULL VOLUME MUSIC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT GMBH, ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, UNIVERSAL - SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC., SCRAP METAL MUSIC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, DON KIRSCHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY AND CRUVEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. THE PHIL'S TAVERN, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FULL VOLUME MUSIC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT GMBH
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL - SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC.
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC.
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV SONGS LLC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELSH WITCH MUSIC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DON KIRSCHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY AND CRUVEN, INC.
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCRAP METAL MUSIC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP.
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALVATORE PAONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PHIL'S TAVERN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES COMPAGNUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?