RUDISILL v. INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS et al
Plaintiff: SOJOURNER RUDISILL
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS and US AIRWAYS/AMERICAN AIRLINES
Case Number: 2:2018cv05435
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF RACHEL S. JANGER, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/30/19.1/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPY MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 1/31/19)(kw, )
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF MARK W. ROBERTSON, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/30/19.1/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by US AIRWAYS/AMERICAN AIRLINES re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. Robertson ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13313735.), #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Rachel S. Janger ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13313734.), #10 Notice of Appearance (DWYER, MARY) Modified on 1/30/2019 (afm, ).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF RAZIYA BRUMFIELD, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/28/19.1/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF ELIZABETH A. ROMA, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/28/19.1/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including American Airlines Group Inc. with Certificate of Service by US AIRWAYS/AMERICAN AIRLINES.(DWYER, MARY)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by US AIRWAYS/AMERICAN AIRLINES. MEMORANDUM AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Rachel S. Janger, #3 Exhibit A to the Janger Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to the Janger Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(DWYER, MARY) Modified on 1/29/2019 (afm, ).
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. Robertson ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13313735.) filed by US AIRWAYS/AMERICAN AIRLINES.Certificate of Service.(DWYER, MARY)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Rachel S. Janger ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13313734.) filed by US AIRWAYS/AMERICAN AIRLINES.Certificate of Service.(DWYER, MARY)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY PATRICIA DWYER on behalf of US AIRWAYS/AMERICAN AIRLINES with Certificate of Service(DWYER, MARY)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS.Brief in Support and Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Order)(SPEAR, SAMUEL)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Gilbert Simmons by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Simmons Declaration)(SPEAR, SAMUEL)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS.(SPEAR, SAMUEL)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Raziya Brumfield ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13309728.) filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS.Certificate of Service.(SPEAR, SAMUEL)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth A. Roma ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13309673.) filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS.Certificate of Service.(SPEAR, SAMUEL)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL L. SPEAR on behalf of INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS with Certificate of Service(SPEAR, SAMUEL)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 12(b) Procedural Order (CJL)
December 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, US AIRWAYS/AMERICAN AIRLINES. Two Forwarded To: pro se plaintiff on 12/18/18 (jwl, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, US AIRWAYS/AMERICAN AIRLINES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 189530.), filed by SOJOURNER RUDISILL.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUDISILL v. INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS
Represented By: SAMUEL L. SPEAR
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. ROMA
Represented By: RAZIYA O. BRUMFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US AIRWAYS/AMERICAN AIRLINES
Represented By: MARY PATRICIA DWYER
Represented By: MARK W. ROBERTSON
Represented By: RACHEL S. JANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOJOURNER RUDISILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?