ROBLEZ v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: JOJANY SUAREZ ROBLEZ
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv05476
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service re: U.S. Marshal Service0 served Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General by FedEx on 1/7/19 and Social Security Admin by FedEx on 1/8/19 (mbh, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (mbh, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 Social Security Magistrate Consent by JOJANY SUAREZ ROBLEZ. (ti, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE #3 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THE CASE ON THE EXTRANET FOR SELECTION BY A PANEL ATTORNEY.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 12/20/2018.12/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED. COPY TO PRO SE CLERK.(kp, )
December 21, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 2 TO US MARSHAL, 1 TO U.S ATTORNEY on 12/21/2018 (kp, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONS. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT AT NO COST TO PLAINTIFF. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE US ATTORNEY.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 12/20/2018.12/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(kp, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(ahf)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JOJANY SUAREZ ROBLEZ.(ahf)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by JOJANY SUAREZ ROBLEZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY JOJANY SUAREZ ROBLEZ.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBLEZ v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOJANY SUAREZ ROBLEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?