T.N. INCORPORATION LTD. v. FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: T.N. INCORPORATION LTD.
Defendant: FIDELITY INFORMATION SERVICES (THAILAND) LTD., FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES (NETHERLANDS) B.V. and FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05552
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that PLAINTIFF'S SECOND UNCONTESTED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 9) IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY, DEFENDANTS MUST FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 27, 2019.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/14/2019.2/14/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by T.N. INCORPORATION LTD...(O'MALLEY, JOHN)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - AFTER CONSULTATION WITH PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, IT IS ORDERED that PLAINTIFF'S UNCONTESTED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 7) IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY, DEFENDANTS MUST FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 13, 2019.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/4/2019.2/4/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint,, filed by T.N. INCORPORATION LTD...(O'MALLEY, JOHN)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Praecipe to Withdraw Proof of Service filed for Fidelity Information Services (Thailand) Ltd. by T.N. INCORPORATION LTD. re #4 SUMMONS Returned Executed.(MALLEY, JOHN) Modified on 1/31/2019 (md).
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.N. INCORPORATION LTD. re: David Braxton served Summons and Complaint upon FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES (NETHERLANDS) B.V. by hand delivery to authorized agent. FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES (NETHERLANDS) B.V. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (O'MALLEY, JOHN)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.N. INCORPORATION LTD. re: David Braxton served Summons and Complaint upon FIDELITY INFORMATION SERVICES (THAILAND) LTD. by hand delivery to authorized agent. FIDELITY INFORMATION SERVICES (THAILAND) LTD. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (O'MALLEY, JOHN)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.N. INCORPORATION LTD. re: David Braxton served Summons and Complaint upon FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES, INC. by hand delivery to authorized agent. FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES, INC. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (O'MALLEY, JOHN)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by T.N. INCORPORATION LTD..(jaa, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIDELITY INFORMATION SERVICES (THAILAND) LTD., FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES (NETHERLANDS) B.V., FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE189963.) filed by T.N. INCORPORATION LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(jaa, )
December 26, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to FIDELITY INFORMATION SERVICES (THAILAND) LTD., FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES (NETHERLANDS) B.V., FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES, INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/27/18 (jaa, )
December 26, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by T.N. INCORPORATION LTD.. (jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.N. INCORPORATION LTD. v. FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELITY INFORMATION SERVICES (THAILAND) LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES (NETHERLANDS) B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.N. INCORPORATION LTD.
Represented By: JOHN J. O'MALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?