THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF J.G. NASCON, INC. v. FIDELIS DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF J.G. NASCON, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY and FIDELIS DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv05586
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Contract: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE: A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/23/2019 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3-C.(mbh, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST SCHEDULING ORDER: PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ITS AMENDED COMPLAINT BY APRIL 15, 2019; ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE SUBMITTED BY JUNE 12, 2019; ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY OCTOBER 10, 2019; ALL PRETRIAL MEMORANDA AND ANY MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY OCTOBER 31, 2019; AND, THIS CASE SHALL BE PLACED IN THIS COURT'S TRIAL POOL ON NOVEMBER 10, 2019, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 02/12/2019. 02/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US Mail Service re: served Complaint upon Chris Kramer by Certified Mail on 1/14/19 (BONAVITACOLA, MARK)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anise Abdelmohsen re: served Complaint upon Kimberly Munsy by Process Server on 01/9/2019 (BONAVITACOLA, MARK)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Joint by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF J.G. NASCON, INC.. (DORSEY, JOHN)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FIDELIS DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC, UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY.(PETTIT, KATHRYN)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including United States Surety Company (a Maryland corporation) is a wholly owned subsidiary of USSC Holdings, Inc. (a Maryland corporation), which is a wholly owned subsidiary of HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. (an insurance holding company organized under the Compaines Act of Japan) by FIDELIS DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC, UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY.(PETTIT, KATHRYN)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: A pretrial conference will be held on February 12, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Chambers - Room 15614 before the HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. (nds)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF J.G. NASCON, INC. by UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY, FIDELIS DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DELISLE, EDWARD)
December 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to FIDELIS DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC, UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/28/2018 (ahf)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIDELIS DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC, UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190023.), filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF J.G. NASCON, INC..(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF J.G. NASCON, INC. v. FIDELIS DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF J.G. NASCON, INC.
Represented By: MARK D. BONAVITACOLA
Represented By: JOHN J. DORSEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY
Represented By: KATHRYN E. PETTIT
Represented By: EDWARD THOMAS DELISLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELIS DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By: KATHRYN E. PETTIT
Represented By: EDWARD THOMAS DELISLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?