FAISON v. KIDS CHOICE LEARNING CENTER, INC.

Plaintiff: LATOYA FAISON
Defendant: KIDS CHOICE LEARNING CENTER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05612
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KIDS CHOICE LEARNING CENTER, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Memorandum, #4 Certificate of Service)(FECILE-MORELAND, PATRICIA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ATUSA SHIRASB on behalf of KIDS CHOICE LEARNING CENTER, INC. (SHIRASB, ATUSA)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT KIDS CHOICE LEARNING CENTER, INC. ANSWE BY 2/28/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 1/25/19. 1/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA FECILE-MORELAND on behalf of KIDS CHOICE LEARNING CENTER, INC. (FECILE-MORELAND, PATRICIA)
January 19, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Campbell re: served Summons and Complaint upon Kid's Choice Learning Center, Inc. by Personal Service Upon Corporation on 1/7/2019 (MILLER, CAROLINE)
December 28, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LATOYA FAISON. (ahf)
December 28, 2018 Summons Issued as to KIDS CHOICE LEARNING CENTER, INC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/28/2018 (ahf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIDS CHOICE LEARNING CENTER, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13253090.), filed by LATOYA FAISON.(MILLER, CAROLINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAISON v. KIDS CHOICE LEARNING CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATOYA FAISON
Represented By: CAROLINE MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIDS CHOICE LEARNING CENTER, INC.
Represented By: PATRICIA FECILE-MORELAND
Represented By: ATUSA SHIRASB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?