GUTIERREZ v. CITIZENS BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA et al

Plaintiff: GLORIA A. GUTIERREZ
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA SHERIFFS OFFICE, PBDK PROPERTIES LLC, DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE, CITIZENS BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA, JEWELL WILLIAMS and CITIZENS BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00081
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond as to #8 Order, #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by GLORIA A. GUTIERREZ..(RUSHIE, A.) Modified on 3/7/2019 (md).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 3/7/19 TO FILE A RESPONSE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/25/19. 2/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PBDK PROPERTIES LLC.BRIEF and CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(GULASH, JESSICA)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA M. GULASH on behalf of PBDK PROPERTIES LLC (GULASH, JESSICA)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ELECTRONIC FILE (DOC. 2) IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF SHALL BE GRANTED ACCESS TO THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING SYSTEM FOR PURPOSES OF THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/8/19. 1/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. *ECF NOTIFICATION/REGISTRATION PACKET SENT TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF ON 1/8/19*(rf, )
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PETITION FOR WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE, FRAUD, TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE OF CONTRACT, BREACH OF CONTRACT, CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST, QUIET TITLE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER/INJUNCTIVE RELIEF IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/8/19. 1/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(rf, ) Modified on 1/9/2019 (rf, ).
January 7, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GLORIA A. GUTIERREZ. (jwl, )
January 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to CITIZENS BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA, CITIZENS BANK, N.A., PBDK PROPERTIES LLC, PHILADELPHIA SHERIFFS OFFICE, JEWELL WILLIAMS. Five Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/8/19 (jwl, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO ELECTRONIC FILE OR ECF IN THE USDC filed by GLORIA A. GUTIERREZ..(jwl, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE, FORECLOSURE FRAUD, TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE OF CONTRACT, BREACH OF CONTRACT, CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST, QUIET TITLE, AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER/ INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by GLORIA A. GUTIERREZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Receipt #190507, $400)(jwl, ) Modified on 1/8/2019 (jwl, ). Modified on 1/8/2019 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUTIERREZ v. CITIZENS BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA SHERIFFS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBDK PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: JESSICA M. GULASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEWELL WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA A. GUTIERREZ
Represented By: A. JORDAN RUSHIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?