CMFG LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. HARGAN-GERBER et al
Plaintiff: CMFG LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER and MEGAN E. HARGAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00132
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Referring Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Interpleader (Unopposed) filed by ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER.Certificate of Service.(HERROLD, TYSON)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG, TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES II, AS RELATED TO NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY V. ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER, ET AL., CIVIL ACTION NO.: 18-CV-4563 AND THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA V. ASHLEY HARGAN, ET AL., CIVIL ACTION NO.: 18-CV-4514. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/26/19. 2/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED. (va, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge C. Darnell Jones II (Unopposed) filed by ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER.Certificate of Service.(HERROLD, TYSON)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER TO ANSWER BY 3/11/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/4/19. 2/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED. (va, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint (Unopposed) filed by ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HERROLD, TYSON)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TYSON Y. HERROLD on behalf of ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER with Certificate of Service(HERROLD, TYSON)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CMFG LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re: James O. Inglefield III served Summons and Complaint upon MEGAN E. HARGAN by Personal service on PFC Deputy Sheriff authorized to accept service. MEGAN E. HARGAN served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. (PROMER, ALAN)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CMFG LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re: Harry Gordon served Summons and Complaint upon ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER by Personal. ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (PROMER, ALAN)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 12(b) Procedural Order (CJL)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent CUNA MUTUAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC. for CMFG LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. by CMFG LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(jl, )
January 9, 2019 2 Summons Issued as to MEGAN E. HARGAN, ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER. Forwarded To: ALAN PROMER on 1/10/19 (jl, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT INTERPLEADER against MEGAN E. HARGAN, ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE190649.), filed by CMFG LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMFG LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. HARGAN-GERBER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMFG LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ALAN C. PROMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY K. HARGAN-GERBER
Represented By: TYSON Y. HERROLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGAN E. HARGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?