EPHLIN et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al

Plaintiff: JOHN EPHLIN and ROSEMARIE EPHLIN
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. and MERCK & CO., INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00150
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROSEMARIE EPHLIN, JOHN EPHLIN. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (FUNK, ADAM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance of Attorney Dino Sangiamo for Merck & Co., Inc. and MerckSharp & Dohme Corp filed by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(SANGIAMO, DINO) Modified on 1/14/2019 (kp, ).
January 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOHN EPHLIN, ROSEMARIE EPHLIN. (ahf)
January 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/10/2019 (ahf)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190701.), filed by ROSEMARIE EPHLIN, JOHN EPHLIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EPHLIN et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN EPHLIN
Represented By: ADAM T. FUNK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARIE EPHLIN
Represented By: ADAM T. FUNK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?