ZLATKEVICH v. MAIN US POST OFFICE

Plaintiff: LEV ZLATKEVICH
Defendant: MAIN US POST OFFICE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00154
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 US Marshal Return Re: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED UPON MAIN US POST OFFICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 2/5/2019. (amas)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/12/19. 2/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by MAIN US POST OFFICE AND PLAINTIFF OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF LOCAL RULE 41.1(b) ORDER (SULLIVAN, GERALD)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD B. SULLIVAN on behalf of MAIN US POST OFFICE with Certificate of Service(SULLIVAN, GERALD)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US Marshals re: served Summons & Complaint upon Atty. General by FedEx on 1/28/19 (ti, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
January 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to MAIN US POST OFFICE, One Original Given to the U.S. Attorney and Two Originals Forwarded To: US Marshals on 1/13/19 (ti, )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 4(i) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/11/19.1/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(ti, )
January 10, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MAIN US POST OFFICE, filed by LEV ZLATKEVICH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY LEV ZLATKEVICH.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZLATKEVICH v. MAIN US POST OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAIN US POST OFFICE
Represented By: GERALD B. SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEV ZLATKEVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?