GALLAGHER v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: SEAN GALLAGHER
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00176
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BARRY SCATTON on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (SCATTON, BARRY)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by YURI J. BRUNETTI on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)(BRUNETTI, YURI)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 7/10/2019 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(ahf)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR AMTRAK TO FILE ITS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 3/14/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/21/19. 2/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. GILLIN on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (GILLIN, DANIEL)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by YURI J. BRUNETTI on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (BRUNETTI, YURI)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon J.L.H. Johnson by Ceritified Mail on 01/22/2019 (MYERS, ROBERT)
January 11, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf)
January 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SEAN GALLAGHER. (ahf)
January 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/14/2019 (ahf)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190815.), filed by SEAN GALLAGHER.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GALLAGHER v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: ROBERT E. MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: BARRY SCATTON
Represented By: DANIEL J. GILLIN
Represented By: YURI J. BRUNETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?