CROCKETT v. LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KATHERINE CROCKETT
Defendant: DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., AMERICAN REGENT, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VIFOR PHARMA - ASPEREVA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00276
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 108 Second Amended Complaint against AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD. filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT, Certificate of Service.(mbh, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Support re #83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD.. (OLSON, HEATHER)
January 29, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JEANNINE M. KENNEY on behalf of KATHERINE CROCKETT(KENNEY, JEANNINE)
January 28, 2020 Filing 105 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #104 Transcript - PDF, 1/29/20 Entered and Copies Emailed. (mbh, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 104 Transcript of Hearing held on January 16, 2020 before Judge Wendy Beetlestone. Court Reporter/Transcriber Burke Court Reporting. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2020. (mbh, )
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER THAT MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DOC NOS 57 & 78) ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF SHALL AMEND HER COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 2/25/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/28/20. 1/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/28/20. 1/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 101 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #100 MOTION TO STAY. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/24/2020.1/24/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nm, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 100 Joint MOTION to Stay RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS AND RELATED FILINGS filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
January 17, 2020 Filing 99 Minute Entry for oral argument held on 1/16/20 before Judge Beetlestone. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE by KATHERINE CROCKETT re #70 Response in Opposition to Motion to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Denial of Preliminary Objections, #2 Exhibit Denial of Preliminary Objections)(DALY, MICHAEL)
January 10, 2020 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM of Law in Response re #83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(DALY, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/13/2020 (lisad, ).
January 9, 2020 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Support re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint - Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's "Notice of Supplemental Authority Relevant to Defendants' Rule 12(b) Motion to Dismiss" filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.. (CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE by KATHERINE CROCKETT re #70 Response in Opposition to Motion - Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority Related to Defendants' Rule 12 Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DALY, MICHAEL)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GOVERNING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/16/19. 12/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE by KATHERINE CROCKETT Parties Joint Notice and Request for Entry of Courts Default Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Electronic Discovery Order)(DALY, MICHAEL)
December 12, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 1/16/2020 02:00 PM IN COURTROOM 10A FOLLOWING THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF THE STATUS CONFERENCE CALL SET FOR DECEMBER 17, 2019 AT 3:00 P.M. - RESET FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE IN COURT ON THURSDAY, JANUARY 16, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 10 A. PLEASE MAKE NOTE OF THIS CHANGE IN DATE AND TIME. THANK YOU. (amw, )
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF HEIDI LEVINE, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/11/19. 12/12/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF PAUL J. ZIDLICKY, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/11/19. 12/12/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (W/ ECF APPLICTION) AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 9, 2019 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.. (SEE PAPER #88 FOR ATTACHMENT).(fb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION for Disclosure Statement filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD..Disclosure Statement. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; WRONG EVENT). (CHRISTIAN, RANDALL) Modified on 12/10/2019 (fb).
December 9, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD..Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of N. Saito, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Excerpts, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
November 25, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13948669.) filed by VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD..Motion and Certificate of Service.(OLSON, HEATHER)
November 25, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Paul Zidlicky ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13948649.) filed by VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD..Motion and Certificate of Service.(OLSON, HEATHER)
November 25, 2019 Filing 84 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Vifor Pharma Management Ltd., wholly owned by Vifor Pharma Participations Ltd, wholly owned by Vifor Pharma Ltd., all Swiss companies by VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD..(OLSON, HEATHER)
November 25, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD..Memorandum, Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B)(BIXLER, ALBERT)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A PROPOSED ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY PROTOCOL ON OR BEFORE 12/13/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/15/2019. 11/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
November 12, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF IN COURT STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 22, 2019 AT 9:30 A.M. A CONFERENCE CALL IS SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 17, 2019 AT 3:00 P.M. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL INITIATE THE CALL AND ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE CALL IN TO CHAMBERS TO CONNECT THE JUDGE AT 267-299-7450. THANK YOU. (amw, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 80 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/18/19. 10/18/19 ENTERED AND MAILED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREPS.(jl, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER THAT PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER ON OR BEFORE 10/14/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/11/2019.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/11/2019. 10/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 78 REPLY Brief in Support re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.. (CHRISTIAN, RANDALL) Modified on 10/15/2019 (fb).
October 9, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: DISCOVERY DUE BY 12/14/2020. (mbh, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SCHEDULING ORDER: THE DEADLINE FOR AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 12/20/2019. ALL CASE SPECIFIC FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 12/14/20. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 6/25/2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/8/19. 10/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) Modified on 10/10/2019 (fb). Modified on 10/10/2019 (mbh, ).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER THAT VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING IS DUE ON OR BEFORE 11/25/19. DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING IS DUE ON BEFORE 12/9/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/8/19. 10/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, .
October 8, 2019 Filing 75 STIPULATION re #72 Order by KATHERINE CROCKETT. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (MAGEE, GABRIEL) Modified on 10/9/2019 (fb).
October 8, 2019 Filing 74 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MAGEE, GABRIEL)
October 7, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MAGEE, GABRIEL) Modified on 10/10/2019 (nd, ).
October 1, 2019 Filing 72 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER ON OR BEFORE 10/9/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/1/19. 10/2/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING #69 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 09/30/2019.09/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DALY, MICHAEL)
September 27, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of the Page Limit for the Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT.Certificate of Service.(DALY, MICHAEL)
September 27, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE CALL MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 30, 2019 AT 11:00 A.M. RE: PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER FAXED TO CHAMBERS ON 9.25.19. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL INITIATE THE CALL AND ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE CALL IN TO CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7450 TO CONNECT THE JUDGE. (amw, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO APPROVE ASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES TO JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/24/19.9/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 66 Joint MOTION TO CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ TO APPROVE ASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES TO JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
September 4, 2019 Filing 65 Minute Entry for Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/30/19 before Judge Beetlestone in Courtroom 10-A. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/19 AT 9:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/3/19. 9/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 63 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #62 Transcript - PDF,, 8/29/19 Entered and Copies Emailed. (mbh, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 62 Transcript of Telephonic Conference Call held on July 30, 2019 before Judge Wendy Beetlestone. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon Gagliardi. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2019. (mbh, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANNINE M. KENNEY on behalf of KATHERINE CROCKETT with Certificate of Service(KENNEY, JEANNINE)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING #58 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHAEL C. ZOGBY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/20/19. 8/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND ATTY (WITH FORMS) AND E-MAILED. (va, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 59 Copy of Order/Notice dated 7/31/19 (Document # 51) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to VIFOR PHARMA-ASPEREVA PHARMACEUTICALS INC for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (rf, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael C. Zogby ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13740068.) filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Certificate of Service.(GIORDANELLA, HEATHER)
August 15, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
August 8, 2019 Filing 56 Report Of JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.. (CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
August 8, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED CONFERENCE AT THE REQUEST OF THE SERVED DEFENDANTS: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESET FOR 8/30/2019 02:00 PM IN COURTROOM 10A BEFORE THE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, )
August 6, 2019 (3) Summons Issued as to DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD.. Forwarded To: counsel on 8/7/19 (mbh, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 54 First Amended against AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD. filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT, Certificate of Service.(mbh, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 53 COMPLAINT Amended against AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT. (FILED IN ERROR; ATTORNEY TO FILE ORIGINAL SIGNED HARD COPY WITH CLERK'S OFFICE). (MILLROOD, TOBIAS) Modified on 8/2/2019 (fb).
August 1, 2019 Filing 52 Minute Entry for Telephone Conference Call held on 7/30/19 before Judge Beetlestone. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER THAT A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD AT 9:30 ON 8/21/2019 IN COURTROOM 10-A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/30/19. 7/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) .
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO TRANSFER ARE DENIED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO AMEND/CORRECT THE COMPLAINT ARE GRANTED. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IS DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS MATTER IS SCHEDULED FOR A CONFERENCE CALL ON 7/30/19 AT 11:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/23/19. 7/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) .
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO THE PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTERS SHALL BE DUE 9/2/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/22/19. 7/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 48 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT.Memorandum/Certificate of Service.(DALY, MICHAEL)
July 19, 2019 Filing 47 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT.certificate of service.(DALY, MICHAEL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT. (DALY, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KATHERINE CROCKETT As To Defendant Vifor Pharma(DALY, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.. (CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
July 2, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
June 25, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(DALY, MICHAEL)
June 21, 2019 Filing 41 Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 6/20/19 before Judge Beetlestone. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER THAT THE HEARING SET FOR 6/25/19 IS CANCELLED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL SERVE THE NON U.S. DEFENDANTS BY 10/18/19. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE SET FOR 10/23/2019 05:00 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/21/19. 6/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) Modified on 6/24/2019 (mbh, ). (DUPLICATE FILING SEE #39)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT THE HEARING SET FOR 6/25/19 IS CANCELLED. THE RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE SET FOR 10/23/19 AT 5:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/21/19. 6/21/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 38 Proposed Pretrial Order by KATHERINE CROCKETT. (DALY, MICHAEL)
June 17, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE CALL ON TUESDAY, JUNE 18, 2019 AT 2:30 P.M. ON THE RECORD REGARDING FAXES SENT TO CHAMBERS ON 6/11/19 AND 6/12/19 - COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS SHALL INITIATE THE PHONE CALL AND ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE, CALL IN TO CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7450 TO CONNECT THE JUDGE. THANK YOU. (amw, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE CALL ON TUESDAY, JUNE 18, 2019 AT 2:30 P.M. ON THE RECORD REGARDING FAXES SENT TO CHAMBERS ON 6/11/19 AND 6/12/19 - COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS SHALL INITIATE THE PHONE CALL AND ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE, CALL IN TO CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7450 TO CONNECT THE JUDGE. THANK YOU. (amw, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE CALL ON TUESDAY, JUNE 18, 2019 AT 2:30 P.M. ON THE RECORD REGARDING FAXES SENT TO CHAMBERS ON 6/11/19 AND 6/12/19 - COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS SHALL INITIATE THE PHONE CALL AND ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE, CALL IN TO CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7450 TO CONNECT THE JUDGE. THANK YOU. (amw, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE CALL ON TUESDAY, JUNE 18, 2019 AT 2:30 P.M. ON THE RECORD REGARDING FAXES SENT TO CHAMBERS ON 6/11/19 AND 6/12/19 - COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS SHALL INITIATE THE PHONE CALL AND ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE, CALL IN TO CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7450 TO CONNECT THE JUDGE. THANK YOU. (amw, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S EPISTOLARY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A RULE 42 MOTION, NOT TO EXCEED 20 PAGES, BY 6/25/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/11/19. 6/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS AND PLAINTIFFS JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME, THE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO SERVE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS IN EACH OF THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES UNTIL 7/2/19, AND FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO THE ANTICIPATED MOTIONS TO DISMISS UNTIL 8/2/19 IS GRANTED; ETC... SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/10/19. 6/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and for Plaintiffs to Respond filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
June 3, 2019 Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #29 MOTION TO WITHDRAW BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 06/03/2019.06/03/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT.Motion to Withdraw Motion to Remand.(DALY, MICHAEL)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINTS UPON THE NAMED BUT UNSERVED NON-U.S. DEFENDANTS IN THESE MATTERS SHALL BE EXTENDED THROUGH AND UNTIL 6/17/19 OR UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE BY THE PARTIES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/19/19. 4/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED. (JL) Modified on 4/23/2019 (jl, ).
April 2, 2019 Filing 27 Letter from Civil Deputy re: Service Due (amw, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for Telephone Conference Call re: Discovery Dispute held on 3/22/19 before Judge Beetlestone. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE UNTIL 5/22/19 TO COMPLETE ALL JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. A HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO REMAND SHALL BE HELD ON 6/25/19 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/25/19. 3/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION TO RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/21/19. 3/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (WITH ECF FORMS) AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL, MAILED TO UNREPS.(va, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/20/19. 3/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/15/19. 3/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Randall L. Christian ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13412136.) filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Certificate of Service.(GIORDANELLA, HEATHER)
March 12, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY in Support re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition)(DALY, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/13/2019 (fb).
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jl, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A)(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(DALY, MICHAEL)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE/REPLY TO PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS FILED PRIOR TO REMOVAL IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/15/19. 2/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. ABERNETHY on behalf of AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS FILED PRIOR TO REMOVAL filed by KATHERINE CROCKETT.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DALY, MICHAEL)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE COURT'S ORDERS OF JANUARY 30, 2019 (ECF NO.8) AND JANUARY 31, 2019 ARE HEREBY VACATED AND THAT DEFENDANTS MUST FILE A TIMELY RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN SEVEN DAYS OF THE COURT'S ORDER ADDRESSING THE FORTHCOMING MOTION TP REMAND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/1/19. 2/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to Judge Beetlestone by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (GIORDANELLA, HEATHER)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT (ECF NO.8) IS HEREBY VACATED, DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE 7 DAYS FROM 1/29/19 TO TIMELY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/31/19. 2/1/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 2/4/2019 (mbh, ). VACATED PER ORDER #12.
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by GABRIEL C. MAGEE on behalf of KATHERINE CROCKETT with Certificate of Service(MAGEE, GABRIEL)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' REQUEST IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS IS EXTENDED UNTIL 14 DAYS AFTER THE COURT'S RULING ON THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND PLAINTIFF'S FORTHCOMING MOTION TO REMAND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/30/19. 1/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ). Modified on 2/1/2019 (jl, ). (VACATED PER #10) Modified on 2/4/2019 (mbh, ).VACATED PER ORDER #12.
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER IS GRANTED IN PART, IN THAT DEFENDANTS MUST FILE A TIMELY RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN SEVEN DAYS OF THE COURT'S ORDER ADDRESSING THE FORTHCOMING MOTION TO REMAND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/29/19. 1/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for Status Conference Call held on 1/29/19 in Courtroom 3B before Judge Beetlestone. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE CALL SET FOR TODAY JANUARY 29, 2019 AT 2:00 P.M. RE #4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL INITIATE THE CALL AND ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE CALL IN TO CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7450 TO CONNECT THE JUDGE(amw, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MURPHY, KENNETH)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH A. MURPHY on behalf of AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(MURPHY, KENNETH)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent DAIICHI SAKYO, INC. for AMERICAN REGENT, INC.; Corporate Parent AMERICAN REGENT, INC. for LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ; Corporate Parent DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS, INC. for DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.. with Certificate of Service by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 American Regent, Inc. Disclosure Statement, #2 Daiichi Sankyo, Inc's Disclosure Statement)(ahf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 181102043. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 191133) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form)(ahf) (Attachment 6 replaced on 1/29/2019) (mbh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROCKETT v. LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.
Represented By: RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD.
Represented By: HEIDI LEVINE
Represented By: PAUL J. ZIDLICKY
Represented By: HEATHER REARDON OLSON
Represented By: ALBERT G. BIXLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.
Represented By: HEATHER C. GIORDANELLA
Represented By: RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: KENNETH A. MURPHY
Represented By: MICHAEL C. ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN REGENT, INC.
Represented By: HEATHER C. GIORDANELLA
Represented By: RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: KENNETH A. MURPHY
Represented By: MICHAEL C. ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: HEATHER C. GIORDANELLA
Represented By: RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: KENNETH A. MURPHY
Represented By: MICHAEL C. ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIFOR PHARMA - ASPEREVA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC
Represented By: RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN
Represented By: MICHAEL C. ZOGBY
Represented By: HEATHER C. GIORDANELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE CROCKETT
Represented By: MICHAEL G. DALY
Represented By: GABRIEL C. MAGEE
Represented By: JEANNINE M. KENNEY
Represented By: TOBIAS MILLROOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?