THE ESTATE OF RICHARDSON MAPES et al v. SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT, INC.
Plaintiff: JEAN MAPES and THE ESTATE OF RICHARDSON MAPES
Defendant: SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00476
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT IF THE CASE WAS PLACED IN CIVIL SUSPENSE THAT THE CLERK OF COURT TRANSFER THAT CASE FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE TO THE CURRENT DOCKET FOR FINAL DISPOSITION AND CLOSE THE CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/5/19. 3/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON 3/15/2019 AT 2:00 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/27/19. 2/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint together with With Affirmative Defenses of Defendant, Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc. to Plaintiff's Complaint by SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT, INC..(COTTONE, KEVIN)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT SO THT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/6/19. 2/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County, case number 2018-26724. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 191830)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE ESTATE OF RICHARDSON MAPES et al v. SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN C. COTTONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN MAPES
Represented By: FRANCIS J. O'NEILL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF RICHARDSON MAPES
Represented By: FRANCIS J. O'NEILL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?