BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. IV, INC.

Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC MGB NA LLC, GUIRO MUSIC, NAPPY BOY PRODUCTIONS INC., CD ELVIS PUBLISHING, SONY/ATV LATIN MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC and UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC
Defendant: IV, INC., ROBERT RICHARDSON and RICHARD HERNANDEZ
Case Number: 2:2019cv00501
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: A pretrial conference will be held on April 22, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Chambers - Room 15614 before the HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. (nds)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by IV, INC., RICHARD HERNANDEZ, ROBERT RICHARDSON.(MORRIN, WILLIAM) Modified on 4/1/2019 (md).
March 20, 2019 Default Entered (rf, )
March 20, 2019 DEFAULT BY RICHARD HERNANDEZ, IV, INC., ROBERT RICHARDSON FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (rf, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Default CD ELVIS PUBLISHING, UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC, NAPPY BOY PRODUCTIONS INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC MGB NA LLC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., GUIRO MUSIC, SONY/ATV LATIN MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stanley H. Cohen)(COHEN, STANLEY)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CD ELVIS PUBLISHING, UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC, NAPPY BOY PRODUCTIONS INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC MGB NA LLC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., GUIRO MUSIC, SONY/ATV LATIN MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC re: THOMAS KENNEY served Summons and Complaint upon ROBERT RICHARDSON by PERSONAL SERVICE. ROBERT RICHARDSON served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (rf, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CD ELVIS PUBLISHING, UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC, NAPPY BOY PRODUCTIONS INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC MGB NA LLC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., GUIRO MUSIC, SONY/ATV LATIN MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC re: THOMAS KENNEY served Summons and Complaint upon RICHARD HERNANDEZ by PERSONAL SERVICE. RICHARD HERNANDEZ served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (rf, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CD ELVIS PUBLISHING, UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC, NAPPY BOY PRODUCTIONS INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC MGB NA LLC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., GUIRO MUSIC, SONY/ATV LATIN MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC re: THOMAS KENNEY served Summons and Complaint upon IV, INC. by PERSONAL SERVICE. IV, INC. served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (rf, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, INC. for BROADCAST MUSIC, INC.; Corporate Parent VIVENDI SA for UNIVERSAL MUSIC MGB NA LLC, UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC ; Corporate Parent SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, INC. for SONY/ATV LATIN MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC. by BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., NAPPY BOY PRODUCTIONS INC., SONY/ATV LATIN MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, UNIVERSAL MUSIC MGB NA LLC, UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC.(mbh, )
February 5, 2019 Three (3) Summons Issued as to IV, INC, ROBERT RICHARDON and RICHARD HERNANDEZ. Forwarded To: counsel on 2/6/19 (mbh, ).
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against IV, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE191994) filed by CD ELVIS PUBLISHING, UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC, NAPPY BOY PRODUCTIONS INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC MGB NA LLC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., GUIRO MUSIC, and SONY/ATV LATIN MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Managment Track form, #3 Designation form)(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. IV, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL MUSIC MGB NA LLC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUIRO MUSIC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAPPY BOY PRODUCTIONS INC.
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CD ELVIS PUBLISHING
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV LATIN MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC
Represented By: STANLEY H. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IV, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM B. MORRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT RICHARDSON
Represented By: WILLIAM B. MORRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD HERNANDEZ
Represented By: WILLIAM B. MORRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?