UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WEISS
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CHARLES J. WEISS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00502
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER CHARLES J. WEISS; DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AN ANSWER OR RESPONSIVE PLEADING BY MAY 24, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 04/04/2019.04/05/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(nd, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KUMAR, NISHANT)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. CHARLES J. WEISS waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (KUMAR, NISHANT)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MATTHEW B. MILLER on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(MILLER, MATTHEW)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by NISHANT KUMAR on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(KUMAR, NISHANT)
February 5, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to CHARLES J. WEISS. Forwarded To: MATTHEW B. MILLER on 2/5/19 (jl, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHARLES J. WEISS (NO FEE REQUIRED), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WEISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES J. WEISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MATTHEW B. MILLER
Represented By: NISHANT KUMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?