HERNANDEZ v. INDEPENDENCE TREE SERVICE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JESSE HERNANDEZ
Defendant: INDEPENDENCE TREE SERVICE, LLC, SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY and NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00510
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT INDEPENDENCE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS granting #7 IS HEREBY GRANTED IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 7.1(C). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES (INCLUDING ALL DEMANDS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES, AND ALLEGATIONS OF GROSS NEGLIGENCE AND RECKLESSNESS AGAINST SAID DEFENDANT) ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/20/19.3/22/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 Praecipe to Withdraw Motion for Remand by JESSE HERNANDEZ. (GOODMAN, JEFFREY)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (mbh, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Remand TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (STOLYAR, VICTORIYA)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Remand TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. (FOREMAN, MELANIE)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JESSE HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. WAGNER on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with Jury Demand(WAGNER, THOMAS)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(STOLYAR, VICTORIYA)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION Of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(STOLYAR, VICTORIYA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Remand TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY filed by JESSE HERNANDEZ.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT) Modified on 3/13/2019 (lvj, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by YURI J. BRUNETTI on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (BRUNETTI, YURI)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIYA STOLYAR on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (STOLYAR, VICTORIYA)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES filed by INDEPENDENCE TREE SERVICE, LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(BARRETT, WILLIAM)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. MCKENZIE on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY (MCKENZIE, THOMAS)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.Memorandum of Law; Certificate of Service.(FOREMAN, MELANIE)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL B. DORDICK on behalf of JESSE HERNANDEZ (DORDICK, SAMUEL)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY P. GOODMAN on behalf of JESSE HERNANDEZ (GOODMAN, JEFFREY)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by INDEPENDENCE TREE SERVICE, LLC.(ahf)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INDEPENDENCE TREE SERVICE, LLC from Court of Common Pleas of Philadephia County, case number 181202689. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 191986) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ v. INDEPENDENCE TREE SERVICE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDEPENDENCE TREE SERVICE, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM P. BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Represented By: THOMAS P. WAGNER
Represented By: MELANIE J. FOREMAN
Represented By: THOMAS J. MCKENZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: YURI J. BRUNETTI
Represented By: VICTORIYA STOLYAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE HERNANDEZ
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?