ROGERS et al v. A.O. SMITH CORP. et al

Plaintiff: WILLIAM R. ROGERS, III and SUSAN M. ROGERS
Defendant: CROWN BOILER, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, BRYANT HEATING AND COOLING, ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF, SQUARE D COMPANY, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, AURORA PUMP, PP&L CORPORATION, BROUDY SUPPLY, J.J. WHITE, INC., PHILADELPHIA ELECTRIC CO., HARTFORD STEAM BOILER, PH GLATFELTER, CRANE CO., CLARK CONTROLLER CO., DRAVO CORPORATION, HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES, BW/IP INC., KEELER-DORR-OLIVER, INC., GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES CO., BLACKMER PUMPS, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC., I.U. NORTH AMERICA INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS INC., PENNSYLVANIA ELECTRIC COMPANY, MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES, ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., COLUMBIA BOILER CO. OF POTTSTOWN, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., ITT BELL GOSSET, JOHN CRANE, INC., HONEYWELL, INC., BF GOODRICH COMPANY, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, COONEY BROTHERS, PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., BOILER TUBE CO. OF AMERICA, COMPUDYNE CORP., BURNHAM LLC, METROPOLITAN EDISON COMPANY, J.A. SEXAUER, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., TRANE US INC., BEAZER EAST, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., COPES VULCAN, BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC, W.W. GRAINGER, HAJOCA CORPORATION, EATON CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER, CBS CORPORATION, BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. and WEIL MCLAIN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00573
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 108 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT, Inc. with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS INC..(LUXTON, STEVEN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. LUXTON on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS INC. with Certificate of Service(LUXTON, STEVEN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 106 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT, Inc. with Certificate of Service by ITT BELL GOSSET.(LUXTON, STEVEN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. LUXTON on behalf of ITT BELL GOSSET with Certificate of Service(LUXTON, STEVEN)
April 5, 2019 28 Summons Issued as to BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., BEAZER EAST, BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRYANT HEATING AND COOLING, BURNHAM LLC, CARRIER CORPORATION, CLARK CONTROLLER CO., COPES VULCAN, CROWN BOILER, DRAVO CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GOULDS PUMPS INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., HAJOCA CORPORATION, I.U. NORTH AMERICA INC., ITT BELL GOSSET, J.J. WHITE, INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., METROPOLITAN EDISON COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES, PENNSYLVANIA ELECTRIC COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, PH GLATFELTER, PHILADELPHIA ELECTRIC CO., PP&L CORPORATION, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 4/8/2019 (sg, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 104 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, AURORA PUMP, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., BEAZER EAST, BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, BLACKMER PUMPS, BOILER TUBE CO. OF AMERICA, BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INC., BROUDY SUPPLY, BRYANT HEATING AND COOLING, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., BURNHAM LLC, BW/IP INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC., CLARK CONTROLLER CO., CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., COLUMBIA BOILER CO. OF POTTSTOWN, COMPUDYNE CORP., COONEY BROTHERS, COPES VULCAN, CRANE CO., CROWN BOILER, DRAVO CORPORATION, EATON CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GOULDS PUMPS INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., HAJOCA CORPORATION, HARTFORD STEAM BOILER, HONEYWELL, INC., HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES, I.U. NORTH AMERICA INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, ITT BELL GOSSET, J.A. SEXAUER, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES CO., J.J. WHITE, INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., KEELER-DORR-OLIVER, INC., METROPOLITAN EDISON COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES, MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, PENNSYLVANIA ELECTRIC COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, PH GLATFELTER, PHILADELPHIA ELECTRIC CO., PP&L CORPORATION, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, SQUARE D COMPANY, TRANE US INC., W.W. GRAINGER, WEIL MCLAIN, filed by WILLIAM R. ROGERS, III, SUSAN M. ROGERS.(sg, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 103 ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, AURORA PUMP, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., BEAZER EAST, BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, BLACKMER PUMPS, BOILER TUBE CO. OF AMERICA, BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INC., BROUDY SUPPLY, BRYANT HEATING AND COOLING, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., BURNHAM LLC, BW/IP INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC., CLARK CONTROLLER CO., CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., COLUMBIA BOILER CO. OF POTTSTOWN, COMPUDYNE CORP., COONEY BROTHERS, COPES VULCAN, CRANE CO., CROWN BOILER, DRAVO CORPORATION, EATON CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GOULDS PUMPS INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., HAJOCA CORPORATION, HARTFORD STEAM BOILER, HONEYWELL, INC., HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES, I.U. NORTH AMERICA INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, ITT BELL GOSSET, J.A. SEXAUER, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES CO., J.J. WHITE, INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., KEELER-DORR-OLIVER, INC., METROPOLITAN EDISON COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES, MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, PENNSYLVANIA ELECTRIC COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, PH GLATFELTER, PHILADELPHIA ELECTRIC CO., PP&L CORPORATION, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, SQUARE D COMPANY, TRANE US INC., W.W. GRAINGER, WEIL MCLAIN and Response to All Cross-Claims by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL.(ADAMS, WILLIAM) Modified on 4/1/2019 (tjd).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IS GRANTED; THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; THE MOTION TO DISMISS CROSS-CLAIMS IS DENIED AS PREMATURE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/28/19.3/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 101 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, Answer to Crossclaims by KEELER-DORR-OLIVER, INC. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(CARRERAS, LINA) Modified on 3/28/2019 (tjd).
March 26, 2019 Filing 100 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with certificate of service by BF GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
March 20, 2019 Filing 99 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by COMPUDYNE CORP..(BRUCH, G.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 98 Compudyne Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by COMPUDYNE CORP..(BRUCH, G.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of COMPUDYNE CORP. with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 96 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 95 ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ALLEN-BRADLEY CO.S ANSWER to Complaint AND JURY DEMAND; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; CROSS-CLAIMS; AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 93 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 92 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE CO. with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 90 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jaa, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 89 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by W.W. GRAINGER.(REBER, W.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of W.W. GRAINGER with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Cross Claims filed by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING. (DISIPIO, BASIL)
March 18, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. JOHANSON on behalf of COLUMBIA BOILER CO. OF POTTSTOWN (JOHANSON, THOMAS)
March 15, 2019 Filing 85 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BW/IP INC. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(TURLIK, JOHN) Modified on 3/19/2019 (tjd).
March 15, 2019 Filing 84 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BW/IP INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
March 15, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
March 15, 2019 Filing 82 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WEIL MCLAIN. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (TURLIK, JOHN) Modified on 3/19/2019 (tjd).
March 15, 2019 Filing 81 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WEIL MCLAIN.(TURLIK, JOHN)
March 15, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of WEIL MCLAIN (TURLIK, JOHN)
March 15, 2019 Filing 79 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by A.W. CHESTERTON, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
March 15, 2019 Filing 78 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service.(TURLIK, JOHN) Modified on 3/19/2019 (tjd).
March 15, 2019 Filing 77 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION.(TURLIK, JOHN)
March 15, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
March 12, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Cross Claims filed by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES.Proposed Order, Brief in Support, Certificate of Service.(WASKOM, THOMAS)
March 11, 2019 Filing 74 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GARDNER DENVER.(SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
March 11, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GARDNER DENVER. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN) Modified on 3/13/2019 (tjd).
March 8, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER on behalf of GARDNER DENVER (SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
March 8, 2019 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HARTFORD STEAM BOILER. Affirmative Defenses.(BONNER, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/12/2019 (tjd).
March 8, 2019 Filing 70 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including HSB Group, Inc., Munich-American Holding Corporation, Muencher Rueckversicherungs with Certificate of Service by HARTFORD STEAM BOILER.(BONNER, MICHAEL)
March 8, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. BONNER on behalf of HARTFORD STEAM BOILER (BONNER, MICHAEL)
March 7, 2019 Filing 68 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY.(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
March 7, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY on behalf of ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
March 6, 2019 Filing 66 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Babcock Power, Inc. with Certificate of Service by BOILER TUBE CO. OF AMERICA.(PARSELLS, DAVID)
March 6, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN D. WILKINSON on behalf of CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WILKINSON, KATHLEEN)
March 6, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BLOCK on behalf of BROUDY SUPPLY with Certificate of Service(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
March 5, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Reply (Corporation Search), #3 Exhibit B to Reply (Declaration), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WASKOM, THOMAS)
March 5, 2019 Filing 62 Defendant, Boiler Tube Co. of America's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Certificate of Service against All Defendants by BOILER TUBE CO. OF AMERICA.(PARSELLS, DAVID)
March 5, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW C. BRUNELLI on behalf of BOILER TUBE CO. OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(BRUNELLI, MATTHEW)
March 5, 2019 Filing 60 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SQUARE D COMPANY.(REBER, W.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of SQUARE D COMPANY with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA M. RIDEOUT on behalf of SQUARE D COMPANY with Certificate of Service(RIDEOUT, CHRISTINA)
March 5, 2019 Filing 57 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Parent Corporation by ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF.(LENGEL, NICOLE)
March 5, 2019 Filing 56 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF.(LENGEL, NICOLE)
March 4, 2019 Filing 55 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. SMITH CORPORATION by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FINCH, EDWARD)
March 4, 2019 Filing 54 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FINCH, EDWARD)
March 4, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD T. FINCH on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORPORATION with Jury Demand (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FINCH, EDWARD)
March 4, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. PARSELLS on behalf of BOILER TUBE CO. OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(PARSELLS, DAVID)
March 4, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMED BAKRY on behalf of TRANE US INC. (BAKRY, MOHAMED)
March 4, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of TRANE US INC. (RYAN, DANIEL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TRANE US INC..(RYAN, DANIEL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 48 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Ingersoll Rand PLC with Certificate of Service by TRANE US INC..(RYAN, DANIEL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMED BAKRY on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (BAKRY, MOHAMED)
March 1, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (RYAN, DANIEL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMED BAKRY on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (BAKRY, MOHAMED)
March 1, 2019 Filing 44 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Ingersoll Rand PLC with Certificate of Service by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(RYAN, DANIEL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(RYAN, DANIEL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (RYAN, DANIEL)
February 27, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH A. LEWIS on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. (LEWIS, LEAH)
February 27, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. (VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 39 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AURORA PUMP.(HADDEN, JAMES)
February 26, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss of Huntington Ingalls filed by WILLIAM R. ROGERS, III. (PAUL, ROBERT)
February 25, 2019 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
February 25, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
February 25, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL, INC..(HEXSTALL, KEVIN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BLACKMER PUMPS.(RYAN, DANIEL)
February 25, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BLACKMER PUMPS.(RYAN, DANIEL)
February 25, 2019 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by J.A. SEXAUER.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
February 25, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by J.A. SEXAUER.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
February 25, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of BLACKMER PUMPS (RYAN, DANIEL)
February 25, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. SCHEETS on behalf of HONEYWELL, INC. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
February 25, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN ERROL HEXSTALL on behalf of HONEYWELL, INC. (HEXSTALL, KEVIN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (WEIMANN, CHRISTIAN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
February 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. HOWARTH on behalf of BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. with Certificate of Service(HOWARTH, JOHN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. OF JOINDER OF REMOVAL AND INDEPENDENT NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 A)(HOWARTH, JOHN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by LINA M. CARRERAS on behalf of KEELER-DORR-OLIVER, INC. (CARRERAS, LINA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and IMO Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL.(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM R. ADAMS on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL with JURY DEMAND(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims and Reply to Cross-Claims , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, AURORA PUMP, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., BEAZER EAST, BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, BLACKMER PUMPS, BOILER TUBE CO. OF AMERICA, BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INC., BROUDY SUPPLY, BRYANT HEATING AND COOLING, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., BURNHAM LLC, BW/IP INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC., CLARK CONTROLLER CO., CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., COLUMBIA BOILER CO. OF POTTSTOWN, COMPUDYNE CORP., COONEY BROTHERS, COPES VULCAN, CRANE CO., CROWN BOILER, DRAVO CORPORATION, EATON CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GOULDS PUMPS INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., HAJOCA CORPORATION, HARTFORD STEAM BOILER, HONEYWELL, INC., HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES, I.U. NORTH AMERICA INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, ITT BELL GOSSET, J.A. SEXAUER, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES CO., J.J. WHITE, INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., KEELER-DORR-OLIVER, INC., METROPOLITAN EDISON COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES, PENNSYLVANIA ELECTRIC COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, PH GLATFELTER, PHILADELPHIA ELECTRIC CO., PP&L CORPORATION, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, SUSAN M. ROGERS, WILLIAM R. ROGERS, III, SQUARE D COMPANY, TRANE US INC., W.W. GRAINGER, WEIL MCLAIN by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
February 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE LENGEL on behalf of ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF with Jury Demand(LENGEL, NICOLE)
February 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARITY C. HYDE on behalf of ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF with Jury Demand(HYDE, CHARITY)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Belden 1993 LLC with Certificate of Service by BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC.(DEZII, DAWN)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL F. WEISBEIN on behalf of COONEY BROTHERS with Certificate of Service(WEISBEIN, PAUL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of BF GOODRICH COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK TO HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/14/19. 2/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES.Memorandum, Declaration and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Schuck, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WASKOM, THOMAS)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION.(KADISH, ERIC)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN JACKSON on behalf of J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES CO. (JACKSON, DAMIAN)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES.(mbh, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 190001972. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE192232) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track, #6 Civil Coversheet)(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROGERS et al v. A.O. SMITH CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN BOILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYANT HEATING AND COOLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF
Represented By: CHARITY C. HYDE
Represented By: NICOLE LENGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTINA M. RIDEOUT
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: WILLIAM R. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP
Represented By: JAMES P. HADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PP&L CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROUDY SUPPLY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.J. WHITE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA ELECTRIC CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD STEAM BOILER
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BONNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PH GLATFELTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK CONTROLLER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRAVO CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES
Represented By: THOMAS R. WASKOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEELER-DORR-OLIVER, INC.
Represented By: LINA M. CARRERAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORPORATION
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Represented By: EDWARD T. FINCH
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY STOKER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES CO.
Represented By: DAMIAN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKMER PUMPS
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.
Represented By: KATHLEEN D. WILKINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.U. NORTH AMERICA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS INC.
Represented By: STEVEN A. LUXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA BOILER CO. OF POTTSTOWN
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOHANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: LEAH A. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT BELL GOSSET
Represented By: STEVEN A. LUXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN ERROL HEXSTALL
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF GOODRICH COMPANY
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COONEY BROTHERS
Represented By: PAUL F. WEISBEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Represented By: MOHAMED BAKRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOILER TUBE CO. OF AMERICA
Represented By: MATTHEW C. BRUNELLI
Represented By: DAVID J. PARSELLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPUDYNE CORP.
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN EDISON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. SEXAUER
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE US INC.
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Represented By: MOHAMED BAKRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAZER EAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON, INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPES VULCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.W. GRAINGER
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAJOCA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER
Represented By: CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL MCLAIN
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM R. ROGERS, III
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN M. ROGERS
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?