United HealthCare Services, Inc. v. Actavis Holdco U.S., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., PLIVA, INC., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, IMPAX LABORATORIES INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, MYLAN N.V, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., CITRON PHARMA LLC, MYLAN INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC, TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., UDL LABORATORIES INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., AKORN SALES, INC., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., AKORN INC., TELIGENT, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. and MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00629
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(KAVULICH, LAURI)
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by DUANE LOUIS LOFT on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(LOFT, DUANE)
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ABBY L. DENNIS on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(DENNIS, ABBY)
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE SMITH on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(SMITH, KYLE)
February 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by HAMISH P.M. HUME on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(HUME, HAMISH)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER DUNCAN HACKETT on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(HACKETT, JENNIFER)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES R. MARTIN on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(MARTIN, JAMES)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC W. BUETZOW on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUETZOW, ERIC)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JUDITH A. ZAHID on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(ZAHID, JUDITH)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00121. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) transferring case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Cynthia M. Rufe. (AKL) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]
January 23, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Wockhardt USA LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Perrigo New York, Inc., Pliva, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Teligent, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., UDL Laboratories, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Impax Laboratories, Inc., Lannett Company, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mayne Pharma Inc., Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mutual Pharmaceutical Company, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Citron Pharma, LLC, Dava Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Endo International plc, Epic Pharma, LLC, Fougera Pharmaceuticals Inc., Generics Bidco I, LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc.. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Holdco U.S., Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Akorn Sales, Inc., Akorn, Inc., Apotex Corp., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Hamish P.M. Hume, Abby L. Dennis, Kyle Smith, Duane L. Loft, Judith A. Zahid, Eric W. Buetzow, James R. Martin, Jennifer Duncan Hackett as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Antitrust/Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-121 WMW/TNL. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated is a corporate parent of Plaintiff United HealthCare Services, Inc.. (Zamansky, Rory) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6610647) filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zamansky, Rory) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United HealthCare Services, Inc. v. Actavis Holdco U.S., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL LABORATORIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKORN SALES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC PHARMA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKORN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: RORY D. ZAMANSKY
Represented By: ERIC W. BUETZOW
Represented By: DUANE LOUIS LOFT
Represented By: KYLE SMITH
Represented By: HAMISH P.M. HUME
Represented By: ABBY L. DENNIS
Represented By: JUDITH A. ZAHID
Represented By: JENNIFER DUNCAN HACKETT
Represented By: JAMES R. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?