SALVITTI et al v. LASCELLES
Plaintiff: ALFRED SALVITTI, NICO SALVITTI and JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY
Defendant: SCOTT LASCELLES and DANA DISABATINO
Case Number: 2:2019cv00696
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 25 EXHIBIT A to E to the Amended Complaint by JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(KLINE, KATHLEEN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 Amended Complaint against SCOTT LASCELLES and DANA DISABATINO filed by NICO SALVITTI, ALFRED SALVITTI, JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY, Certificate of Service.(mbh, )
April 8, 2019 One (1) Summons Issued as to DANA DISABATINO. Forwarded To: counsel on 4/9/19 (mbh, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for Telephone Status Conference held on 4/8/19 before Judge Robreno Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 11, 2019 BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE RUETER IS CANCELLED. A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON APRIL 25, 2019 AT 3:00 P.M. IN CHAMBERS - ROOM 15614 BEFORE THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 04/8/2019. 04/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for In Chambers Telephone Status & Scheduling Conference held on 4/1/19 before Judge Robreno. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE TELEPHONE STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2019 IS CONTINUED TO APRIL 8, 2019 AT 2:30 P.M.,. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 04/01/2019. 04/01/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2019 AT 2:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 03/27/2019. 03/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY, ALFRED SALVITTI, NICO SALVITTI Letter requesting extension of deadlines (EADS, JOEL)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for Status and Scheduling Conference held on 3/20/19 before Judge Robreno Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE: A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/11/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3-C BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER.(mbh, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL REVIEW THE BOOKS AND RECORDS PROVIDED BY DEFENDANT AND ADVISE DEFENDANT OF ANY QUESTIONS OR ISSUES AS TO WHICH FURTHER EXPLANATION IS CALLED FOR BY THURSDAY, MARCH 21, 2019 AT 12:00 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 03/20/2019. 03/20/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN M. KLINE on behalf of JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY, ALFRED SALVITTI, NICO SALVITTI (KLINE, KATHLEEN)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in Support re #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY, ALFRED SALVITTI, NICO SALVITTI. (EADS, JOEL) Modified on 3/19/2019 (fb).
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by SCOTT LASCELLES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(FELTOON, ROBERT)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE: A status and scheduling conference will be held on March 20, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15A before the HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO.(nds)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SCOTT LASCELLES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lascelles Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(FELTOON, ROBERT)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY, ALFRED SALVITTI, NICO SALVITTI re #8 Notice (Other) Letter in Response to Defendant's Application for Brief Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadlines (EADS, JOEL)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by SCOTT LASCELLES Letter Application for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadlines (FELTOON, ROBERT)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER LUCCA on behalf of SCOTT LASCELLES (LUCCA, CHRISTOPHER)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT N. FELTOON on behalf of SCOTT LASCELLES (FELTOON, ROBERT)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Letter NOTICE requesting hearing by JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY, ALFRED SALVITTI, NICO SALVITTI re #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (EADS, JOEL) Modified on 3/4/2019 (afm, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALFRED SALVITTI, NICO SALVITTI, JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY re: Curtis Savoy served Summons and Complaint upon SCOTT LASCELLES by Civil Process Server. SCOTT LASCELLES served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (EADS, JOEL)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY, ALFRED SALVITTI, NICO SALVITTI.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Declaration)(EADS, JOEL)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 9,631,892 & D713,923. (ahf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCOTT LASCELLES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 192644.), filed by ALFRED SALVITTI, NICO SALVITTI, JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(ahf)
February 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to SCOTT LASCELLES. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/21/2019 (ahf)
February 19, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY, ALFRED SALVITTI, NICO SALVITTI. (ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALVITTI et al v. LASCELLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFRED SALVITTI
Represented By: JOEL MAX EADS
Represented By: KATHLEEN M. KLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICO SALVITTI
Represented By: JOEL MAX EADS
Represented By: KATHLEEN M. KLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN-DAVID POTYNSKY
Represented By: JOEL MAX EADS
Represented By: KATHLEEN M. KLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LASCELLES
Represented By: ROBERT N. FELTOON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER LUCCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA DISABATINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?