ZUNIGA v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: CESAR ZUNIGA
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00726
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE A. KATZ on behalf of CESAR ZUNIGA (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for Pretrial Conference held on 4/10/19 before Judge Pappert (mbh, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH HEY FOR SETTLEMENT. EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 8/8/19. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 8/15/19. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 9/11/19. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DAUBERT MOTIONS (IF NECESSARY) WILL BE HELD ON 9/17/19 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 9/24/19 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 11A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/10/19. 4/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting by CESAR ZUNIGA.(OLLEY, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/28/2019 (fb).
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. ROMAN on behalf of CESAR ZUNIGA (ROMAN, JAMES)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/10/2019 AT 2:00 PM IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/25/19. 3/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(HOHN, RICHARD)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN DOUGHERTY on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (DOUGHERTY, STEPHEN)
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD K. HOHN on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (HOHN, RICHARD)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Complaint upon National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak) by certified mail return receipt requested on March 5, 2019 (OLLEY, MICHAEL)
February 25, 2019 One (1) Summons Issued as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). Forwarded To: counsel on 2/25/19 (mbh, )
February 19, 2019 Demand for Trial by Jury (mbh, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Filing fee $400 receipt number PPE192765) filed by CESAR ZUNIGA.(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZUNIGA v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CESAR ZUNIGA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. OLLEY
Represented By: JAMES J. ROMAN
Represented By: LAWRENCE A. KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: MICHAEL J. OLLEY
Represented By: STEPHEN DOUGHERTY
Represented By: RICHARD K. HOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?