MITCHELL v. THE SIX DISTRICT POLICE STATION OF PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT

Plaintiff: MARVIN ANDRE MITCHELL
Defendant: THE SIX DISTRICT POLICE STATION OF PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00821
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Copy of Order dated 3/20/19 (Document # 5) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to MARVIN ANDRE MITCHELL for the following reason: Return to sender, unable to forward, not deliverable as addressed, discharged. (pr, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DOC. NO. 4) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS REQUESTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 3/20/19.3/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF. (pr, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF MARVIN ANDRE MITCHELL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW COMPLAINT.(jpd, )
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF PLFF. SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CIVIL ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER SUBMIT $400.00 ($350.00 FILING FEE AND $50.00 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PROVIDE MITCHELL A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 2/28/19. 3/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF. WITH A BLANK IFP APPLICATION FORM. (pr, ) Modified on 3/1/2019 (pr, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE SIX DISTRICT POLICE STATION OF PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT, filed by MARVIN ANDRE MITCHELL. NO FEE. NO IFP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/26/2019) (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MITCHELL v. THE SIX DISTRICT POLICE STATION OF PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SIX DISTRICT POLICE STATION OF PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARVIN ANDRE MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?