MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE

Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00917
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26 (f) CONFERENCE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 4/5/19.4/5/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPEONA PRIOR TO A RULE 26 (f) CONFERENCE IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. &636 (b)(1)(A); ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/11/19. 3/13/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
March 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (jwl, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (jwl, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(jwl, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 193453.), filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(jwl, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/12/2019) (ti, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. FIORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?