Cramer v. Cecil Baker & Partners, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bill Cramer
Defendant: Hidden City Philadelphia and Cecil Baker & Partners, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01503
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06700. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case transferred to District of Pennsylvania. Case extracted via ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 4/8/2019. (Greene, Donna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, via stipulation executed by counsel for all parties per Order of Judge Mann by Hidden City Philadelphia. (Corcoran, J Conor) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
March 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by J Conor Corcoran on behalf of Hidden City Philadelphia (notification declined or already on case) (Corcoran, J Conor) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann: Initial Conference Hearing held on 3/28/2019. Fact discovery is to be completed by October 31, 2019. Parties are directed to confer and are encouraged to file, by April 4, 2019, a stipulation transferring the case to the E.D.Pa. See attached Minute Entry. (Kelson, Lise) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of Bill Cramer (aty to be noticed) (Freeman, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
March 25, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Application #9 so-ordered. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/25/2019. (Cardenas, Alex) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11318555. by Hidden City Philadelphia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Corcoran, J Conor) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
March 25, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Application #8 denied without prejudice, for failing to attach the referenced Certificate of Good Standing. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/25/2019. (Cardenas, Alex) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11317162. by Hidden City Philadelphia. (Corcoran, J Conor) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 3/28/2019 @ 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13C South, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED ORDER AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies for distribution of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/12/2019. (Kelson, Lise) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cecil Baker & Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of service) (Kang, Edward) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
November 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Hidden City summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
November 25, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 11/27/2018 (Bowens, Priscilla). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]
November 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cecil Baker & Partners, Inc., Hidden City Philadelphia filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10963412 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Bill Cramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cramer v. Cecil Baker & Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Cramer
Represented By: JAMES H. FREEMAN
Represented By: RICHARD LIEBOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hidden City Philadelphia
Represented By: J. CONOR CORCORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil Baker & Partners, Inc.
Represented By: EDWARD T. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?