MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Abbvie Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC and MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS SALES CORP, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ABBOTT RESPIRATORY LLC, BARR PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ABBVIE INC, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS INC and Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited
Case Number: 2:2019cv01621
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00892. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2019 Case transferred to District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the US Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 4/12/2019 and certified by the Eastern District of PA Clerk's Office on 4/12/2019. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the US District Court for the Eastern District of PA. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel, John W. Nichols on 4/12/2019. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay the Deadline to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/5/2019. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transferr by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Turner, Tracy) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Potential Tag Along in JPML) (Coffin, Christopher) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Respiratory, LLC, Abbvie Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Turner, Tracy) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC re #2 Order to Show Cause, Notice of Filing of Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPML Order) (Turner, Tracy) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the review of plaintiffsClass Action Complaint, in which they state that the Judicial Panelon Multidistrict Litigation has ruled that the case should beconsolidated in an action in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania(Doc. 1 10), and the Court being advised, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file a copy of said Order on or before February 15, 2019. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 02/06/2019. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
December 20, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Respiratory, LLC, Abbvie Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6725160), filed by MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit D-1, #7 Exhibit D-2, #8 Exhibit D-3, #9 Exhibit D-4, #10 Exhibit D-5, #11 Exhibit D-6, #12 Exhibit D-7, #13 Exhibit D-8, #14 Exhibit D-9, #15 Exhibit D-10, #16 Exhibit D-11, #17 Exhibit D-12, #18 Exhibit D-13, #19 Exhibit D-14, #20 Exhibit D-15, #21 Exhibit D-16, #22 Exhibit D-17, #23 Exhibit D-18, #24 Exhibit D-19) (Turner, Tracy) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Abbvie Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS SALES CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT RESPIRATORY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBVIE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: TRACY L. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC
Represented By: TRACY L. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series
Represented By: TRACY L. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?