HOSBACH v. COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

Plaintiff: VANESSA HOSBACH
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv01921
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Commissioner of Social Security via FEDEX on 5/22/19. (rf, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General via FEDEX on 5/22/19. (rf, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Procedural Order 5/13/19 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (jl, )
May 13, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 2 TO U.S. MARSHAL; 1 TO U.S. ATTORNEY on 5/13/19 (jl, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 5/13/19.5/13/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Magistrate Consent by VANESSA HOSBACH.. (MANNICCI, LORI)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(er, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/3/2019) (er, ). (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/8/2019) (er, ).
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (IFP PENDING), filed by VANESSA HOSBACH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(er, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by VANESSA HOSBACH. (er, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOSBACH v. COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA HOSBACH
Represented By: LORI L. MANNICCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?