SABOL v. ALLSTEEL INC. et al
Plaintiff: EDMUND SABOL
Defendant: ALLSTEEL INC., HNI CORPORATION and THE HON COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv01926
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/24/2019 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 6/19/19. 6/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE COURT REFERS THIS ACTION PE3NDING IN MDL 875 TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER FOR PROCEEDINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/18/19. 6/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by HNI CORPORATION.(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by THE HON COMPANY.(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by ALLSTEEL INC..(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATON AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNTIL MAY 20, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 05/13/2019. 05/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nds)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for extension of time by ALLSTEEL INC., HNI CORPORATION, THE HON COMPANY. (MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HNI CORPORATION.(mbh, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent HNI CORPORATION for THE HON COMPANY with Certificate of Service by THE HON COMPANY.(mbh, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent HNI CORPORATION for ALLSTEEL INC. with Certificate of Service by ALLSTEEL INC..(mbh, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by ALLSTEEL INC., HNI CORPORATION and THE HON COMPANY from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 190402116. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE196717), Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track)(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SABOL v. ALLSTEEL INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTEEL INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HNI CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HON COMPANY
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDMUND SABOL
Represented By: JONATHAN D. RUBINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?