STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. COHEN et al
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Defendant: JOSHUA COHEN and GENERAL ELECTRIC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01947
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. JOSHUA COHEN waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GENERAL ELECTRIC.(VOTER, WARREN)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 General Electric Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JOSHUA COHEN by GENERAL ELECTRIC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VOTER, WARREN)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. re: Christine Foran served Summons and Complaint upon GENERAL ELECTRIC by Personal Service. GENERAL ELECTRIC served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
May 6, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
May 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to JOSHUA COHEN, GENERAL ELECTRIC. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/7/19 (jwl, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANIES for STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO..(jwl, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOSHUA COHEN, GENERAL ELECTRIC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 196772.), filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. COHEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC
Represented By: WARREN E. VOTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: DANIEL J. DE LUCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?