O'DONNELL v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: RACHEL O'DONNELL
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv01963
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY R RICE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 US Marshal Return Re: Summons and Complaint Served upon the Commissioner of Social Security on 5/29/19 via FEDEX and the Atty. General on 5/28/19 via FEDEX. See attached receipt. (jaa, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Social Security Magistrate Consent by RACHEL O'DONNELL.. (MARZZACCO, CHRISTOPHER)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT HAVING SERVED NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RACHEL O'DONNELL ON MAY 6, 2019, TO FILE A FORM CONSENTING OR DECLINING THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE WITHIN 21 DAYS, AND PLAINTIFF HAS FAILED TO FILE THE FORM WITHIN THAT TIME PERIOD, PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 5/29/19. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM) 5/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jaa, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Procedural Order 5/9/19 Entered and E-MAILED. (jl, )
May 9, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 2 TO U.S. MARSHAL, 1 TO U.S. ATTORNEY on 5/9/19 (jl, )
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 5/8/19.5/9/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(amas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by RACHEL O'DONNELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by RACHEL O'DONNELL.(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'DONNELL v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL O'DONNELL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MARZZACCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?