JENKINS v. DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE OF PHILADELPHIA et al

Plaintiff: DARRELL ANTHONY JENKINS and DOREL JENKINS
Defendant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE OF PHILADELPHIA, UNIFIED JUDICIAL SYSTEM OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF PENNSYLVANIA COURTS, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA BAR ASSOCIATION, PHILA. POLICE DEPT, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA and PENNSYLVANIA BAR ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv01973
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO REMOVE/ADD DEFENDANTS WHO ARE/ARE NOT IMMUNE TO SUIT, filed by DARRELL ANTHONY JENKINS..(sg, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR COURT ORDERS, filed by DARRELL ANTHONY JENKINS..(sg, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT JENKIN'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ETC. AND IF JENKINS FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/10/19.6/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 PETITIONER'S AFFIDAVIT TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND WITHOUT CERTIFIED PRISON COPY OF INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT OF LAST 6 MONTHS DUE TO OBSTRUCTION, FILED BY DARRELL ANTHONY JENKINS. (amas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT by DARRELL ANTHONY JENKINS.. (jaa, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION FOR PRISONERS TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by DARRELL ANTHONY JENKINS.(jaa, )
May 8, 2019 Blank copy of standard prisoner in forma pauperis form mailed to pro se plff on 5/9/19. (kw, )
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF JENKINS SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER SUBMIT $400 TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH JENKINS WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/8/19. 5/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
May 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DARRELL ANTHONY JENKINS. (jwl, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF PENNSYLVANIA COURTS, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE OF PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA BAR ASSOCIATION, PHILA. POLICE DEPT, PHILADELPHIA BAR ASSOCIATION, UNIFIED JUDICIAL SYSTEM OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, filed by DARRELL ANTHONY JENKINS. NO FEE. NO IFP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/7/2019) (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENKINS v. DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL ANTHONY JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOREL JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIFIED JUDICIAL SYSTEM OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF PENNSYLVANIA COURTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA BAR ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILA. POLICE DEPT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA BAR ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?