SASSA v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE

Plaintiff: AMANDA SASSA
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Case Number: 2:2019cv02015
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS TO BE COMPLETED BY 7/12/2019. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 10/4/2019. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 11/1/2019. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 3038, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET AT 9:30 A.M. ON 11/25/2019. JURY SELECTION WILL TAKE PLACE AT 9:30 A.M. ON 12/2/2019, WITH TRIAL COMMENCING IMMEDIATELY FOLLOWING JURY SELECTION. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 8/1/2019 WILL PROCEED, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 6/19/19. 6/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT AND ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH HEY TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. SEC. 636(c) AND F.R.C.P. 73. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/14/19. 6/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 8/1/2019, AT 1:30 PM, IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 3038), BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 6/11/2019. 6/11/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference held on 6/10/19. (jl, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #5 PAPERS FORWARDED)(rf, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PARAGRAPH 4 OF MY MAY 30, 2019 SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH HEY FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL, AND THEN THE PARTIES SHALL FORTHWITH JOINTLY CONTACT JUDGE HEY'S CHAMBERS TO ARRANGE THIS CONFERENCE. JUDGE HEY WILL REQUIRE THAT LEAD COUNSEL AND PARTIES WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY ATTEND THE CONFERENCE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/6/2019. 6/6/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT TRIAL FOR THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SHALL BE HELD ON 10/1/2019 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 14A, U.S. DISTRICT COURT, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILA., PA 19106. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/25/2019 AT 10:00 A.M. IN ROOM 14614, ETC. DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/1/2019. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OR ABOUT 7/8/2019. ANY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OR OTHER DISPOSITIVE MOTION DUE BY 7/15/2019, ETC. ALL PARTIES SHALL PREPARE & FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THE COURT THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 9/13/2019. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 9/13/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ FOR HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/30/19. 5/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by PAMELA A. CARLOS on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE (CARLOS, PAMELA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE.(GIOFFRE, SAMANTHA)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, IT APPEARING THAT THE MATTER LABELED SASSA V. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, CASE NUMBER 2019-06774, WAS REMOVED FROM THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY COMMON PLEAS COURT AND THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THAT COURT HAS REQUESTED PERMISSION TO SUBMIT RECORDS IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY COMMON PLEAS COURT MAY SUBMIT ALL RELEVANT RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT SO THAT THE CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/21/2019. 5/21/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES' STIPULATION (EX. A) TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S ANSWER DEADLINE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES' STIPULATION (EX. A) IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #1 , EX. A) NO LATER THAN MAY 30, 2019.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/17/2019. 5/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs (BRAKER, ROBERT)
May 9, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE.(jwl, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE from Common Pleas Montgomery County, case number 2019-06774. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197097)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SASSA v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA SASSA
Represented By: ROBERT N. BRAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Represented By: SAMANTHA DESPOSITO GIOFFRE
Represented By: PAMELA A. CARLOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?