INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19 v. ALL SHORE, INC.
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19
Defendant: ALL SHORE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02019
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment against ALL SHORE, INC. filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Fees and Costs, #2 Certificate of Service)(MILZ, MARTIN)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON OR BEFORE 7/17/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/12/2019. 6/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 7, 2019 Default Entered (sg, )
June 7, 2019 DEFAULT BY ALL SHORE, INC. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (sg, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Default against ALL SHORE, INC. INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19 against ALL SHORE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILZ, MARTIN)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19 re: Robert Bassler served Summons and Complaint upon ALL SHORE, INC.. ALL SHORE, INC. served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (MILZ, MARTIN)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
May 9, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
May 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to ALL SHORE, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/9/19 (jwl, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL SHORE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197131.), filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19 v. ALL SHORE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL SHORE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19
Represented By: MARTIN WILLIAM MILZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?