SMITH v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: SHEAQUITA SMITH
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02062
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal to Dismiss action by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (MILLER, LORI)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/17/2019 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS 10614 BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (MILLER, LORI)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LORI C. MILLER on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (MILLER, LORI)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS on behalf of SHEAQUITA SMITH (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA)
May 13, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: BRANDON SWARTZ on 5/14/19 (jl, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE197272.), filed by SHEAQUITA SMITH. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: LORI C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEAQUITA SMITH
Represented By: BRANDON A. SWARTZ
Represented By: MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?