PARKS v. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al

Plaintiff: CALVIN PARKS
Defendant: WILLIAM POSTOWSKI, JR., THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PATRICK DOOLEY, RICHARD ROSS and PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 2:2019cv02070
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED; PLAINTIFF SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350.00 IN INSTALLMENTS; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURT'S ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/5/19. 6/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PR SE PLAINTIFF AND FAXED TO WARDEN OF M.C.C.F.(jpd, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/5/19. 6/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(jpd, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by CALVIN PARKS. (jpd, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF CALVIN PARKS' MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DECLARATION.(jpd, )
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT BECAUSE PLAINTIFF CALVIN PARKS HAS FAILED TO FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT FOR THE COMPLETE SIX-MONTH PERIOD PRIOR TO THE FILING OF THIS CIVIL ACTION ON 5/13/2019, AS REQUIRED BY 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), PARKS'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IF PARKS SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, AND A CURRENT BALANCE, FROM ANY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY IN WHICH HE WAS CONFINED DURING THE TIME PERIOD FROM 11/13/2018 TO 5/13/2019. ALTERNATIVELY, PARKS CAN PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $400 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TOT HE CLERKS OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF PARKS IS ULTIMATELY GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE WILL BE OBLIGATED TO PAY THE $350 FILING FEE IN INSTALLMENTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), EVEN IF HIS CASE IS DISMISSED. HE WILL NOT BE ENTITLED TO THE RETURN OF ANY PAYMENTS MADE TOWARD THE FEE. IF PARKS FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 5/15/2019. 5/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(dmc, )
May 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CALVIN PARKS. (ahf)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by CALVIN PARKS. (ahf)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against PATRICK DOOLEY, PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT, WILLIAM POSTOWSKI, JR, RICHARD ROSS, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, filed by CALVIN PARKS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/15/2019) (ahf, ).
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY CALVIN PARKS.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARKS v. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVIN PARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM POSTOWSKI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK DOOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?