PERRI v. STATE FARM

Plaintiff: PATRICK PERRI
Defendant: STATE FARM
Case Number: 2:2019cv02085
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 order for service, #4 entry of appearance, #5 demand for jury trial, #6 notice of removal)(kw, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by STATE FARM.Certificate of Service.(MILLER, LORI)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PATRICK PERRI. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service)(MURAWSKY, NATHAN)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/3/19. 6/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs (MURAWSKY, NATHAN)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Partial MOTION TO DISMISS Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by STATE FARM. Brief and Certificate of Service.(MILLER, LORI) Modified on 5/21/2019 (tjd).
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM. (MILLER, LORI)
May 14, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM.(jwl, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM from Common Pleas Montgomery County, case number 2019-06618. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197358)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERRI v. STATE FARM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK PERRI
Represented By: NATHAN M. MURAWSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM
Represented By: LORI C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?