TAKACH v. WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: GEORGINE TAKACH
Defendant: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02105
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F KELLY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY. A Telephone Conference was held on 6/21/19. (fdc)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT PARTIES SHALL EXCHANGE THE INITIAL DISCLOSURES REQUIRED BY F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) STARTING 6/21/2019. ALL DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/21/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 6/21/19. 6/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SPAULDING, ANDREW)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY.(SPAULDING, ANDREW)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 PRETRIAL PHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 6/21/2019 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY.(mr, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY.(SPAULDING, ANDREW)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON C. FLEMING on behalf of WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY (FLEMING, ALISON)
May 15, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (jwl, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 190401716. Certificate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197390)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAKACH v. WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANDREW J. SPAULDING
Represented By: ALISON C. FLEMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGINE TAKACH
Represented By: KEVIN M. MALLOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?